Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1552447 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1552447



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 547
22.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.10.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.09.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.09.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.09.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
04.09.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
06.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 4
06.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
23.05.2017 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
02.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 20
27.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 20
27.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 4
06.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.12.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 4
11.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
28.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
28.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
28.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
28.10.2016 Claims Appeal 6
28.10.2016 Claims Appeal 5
28.10.2016 Claims Appeal 5
28.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
05.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.08.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.08.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
30.08.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.06.2016 General enquiry Appeal 1
04.01.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
11.12.2015 General enquiry Appeal 1
25.08.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.08.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 28
20.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.08.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
04.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.02.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
04.02.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.07.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.06.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.06.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
21.06.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Claims Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Claims Appeal 5
30.05.2011 Claims Appeal 4
30.05.2011 Description Appeal 2
30.05.2011 Description Appeal 2
30.05.2011 Description Appeal 2
30.05.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
24.05.2011 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
31.03.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.01.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
25.01.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
21.01.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 16
21.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
21.01.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
21.01.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 12
21.01.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
21.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.11.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.11.2010 Annex Search / examination 1
09.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
09.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
09.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 10
12.07.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
10.07.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.07.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
08.07.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.07.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.12.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.11.2009 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
21.11.2008 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.11.2008 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.11.2008 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
18.11.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.10.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.07.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.07.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
24.06.2008 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
18.01.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.11.2007 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.11.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.11.2007 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2007 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
03.08.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
15.05.2007 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.11.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.11.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
01.11.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.09.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.04.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.04.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
01.06.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.03.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
15.02.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.02.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
26.01.2005 Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase Search / examination 1
11.01.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
29.10.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.06.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
24.12.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
24.12.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25