Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1552002

EP1552002 - APTAMER-TOXIN MOLECULES AND METHODS FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.05.2007  [2007/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Archemix Corp.
One Hampshire Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2005/28]
Inventor(s)01 / STANTON, Martin
64 Harvard Road
Stow, MA 01775 / US
02 / KURZ, Markus
44 Pine Street
Newton, MA 02465 / US
 [2005/28]
Representative(s)Clegg, Richard Ian , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]Clegg, Richard Ian , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2005/28]Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane
London EC2V 8EY / GB
Application number, filing date03760481.618.06.2003
[2005/28]
WO2003US19496
Priority number, dateUS20020390042P18.06.2002         Original published format: US 390042 P
[2005/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO03106659
Date:24.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1552002
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003
[2005/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.04.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C07H21/04
[2005/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:APTAMER-TOXINMOLEKÜLE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG[2005/28]
English:APTAMER-TOXIN MOLECULES AND METHODS FOR USING SAME[2005/28]
French:MOLECULES TOXINE-APTAMERE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS[2005/28]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2005National basic fee paid 
17.01.2005Search fee paid 
17.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/28]
18.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/19]
21.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9214843  (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 12, line 30 - page 15, line 7 * * page 16, line 20 - page 18, line 19 * * page 28, line 30 - page 29, line 25 * * page 60, line 11 - page 62, line 2 * * page 63, line 10 - page 66, line 18 *;
 [DA]US5270163  (GOLD LARRY [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9214842  (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [PDA]WO03014375  (ARCHEMIX CORP [US], et al) [PDA] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - SIEGALL CLAY B, "Targeted toxins as anticancer agents", CANCER (PHILADELPHIA), (1994), vol. 74, no. 3 SUPPL., ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1006 - 1012, XP009058432 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PIRKER R, "IMMUNOTOXINS AGAINST SOLID TUMORS", JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (1988), vol. 114, no. 4, ISSN 0171-5216, pages 385 - 393, XP009058427 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02128183
 [Y]  - PASTAN I ET AL, "RECOMBINANT TOXINS FOR CANCER TREATMENT", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, (19911122), vol. 254, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1173 - 1177, XP000858984 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1683495
 [Y]  - WALDMANN T A, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES IN DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19910621), vol. 252, no. 5013, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1657 - 1661, XP000232755 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2047874
 [Y]  - BODEY B ET AL, "HUMAN CANCER DETECTION AND IMMUNOTHERAPY WITH CONJUGATED AND NON-CONJUGATED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, HELENIC ANTICANCER INSTITUTE, ATHENS,, GR, (1996), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0250-7005, pages 661 - 674, XP009015727 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - GILLILAND D G ET AL, "ANTIBODY DIRECTED CYTO TOXIC AGENTS USE OF MONO CLONAL ANTIBODY TO DIRECT THE ACTION OF TOXIN A CHAINS TO COLO RECTAL CARCINOMA CELLS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1980), vol. 77, no. 8, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4539 - 4543, XP009058435 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.77.8.4539
 [Y]  - BRODY E N ET AL, "APTAMERS AS THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC AGENTS", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (200003), vol. 74, no. 1, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 5 - 13, XP009031105 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - JAYASENA S D, "Aptamers: An emerging class of molecules that rival antibodies in diagnostics", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1999), vol. 45, no. 9, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1628 - 1650, XP002271174 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GEORGE DANIEL, "Platelet-derived growth factor receptors: A therapeutic target in solid tumors", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, (200110), vol. 28, no. 5 Suppl 17, ISSN 0093-7754, pages 27 - 33, XP009058425 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0093-7754(01)90100-9
 [A]  - PIETRAS K ET AL, "INHIBITION OF PLATELET-DERIVED GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTORS REDUCES INTERSTITIAL HYPERTENSION AND INCREASES TRANSCAPILLARY TRANSPORT INTUMORS", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20000401), vol. 61, no. 7, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2929 - 2934, XP002947975 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LAVROVSKY Y ET AL, "THERAPEUTIC POTENTIAL AND MECHANISM OF ACTION OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AND RIBOZYMES", BIOCHEMICAL AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, ORLANDO, FL, US, (1997), vol. 62, ISSN 1077-3150, pages 11 - 22, XP002941380 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bmme.1997.2631
International search[X]US6232071  (HICKE BRIAN [US], et al);
 [X]US2002034506  (PIETRAS KRISTIAN [SE], et al)