Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1513426 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1513426



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 685
09.11.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
07.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
29.09.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 21
04.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.05.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.05.2010 Claims Appeal 1
26.05.2010 Claims Appeal 1
26.05.2010 Claims Appeal 1
26.05.2010 Claims Appeal 1
26.05.2010 Claims Appeal 1
26.05.2010 Claims Appeal 1
26.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.05.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.04.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.04.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.04.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.04.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.04.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
16.04.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.12.2008 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.12.2008 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
10.12.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
08.12.2008 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
08.12.2008 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
20.11.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.10.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
30.09.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.09.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.09.2008 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
02.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Annex to a communication Opposition 12
29.07.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
29.07.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
29.07.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.07.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
29.07.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.07.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 15
16.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
16.06.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
12.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
11.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
09.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
06.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
06.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
05.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.06.2008 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 3
03.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 11
03.06.2008 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Opposition 1
08.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
28.02.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.01.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.10.2007 Brief communication Opposition 1
17.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2007 Authorisation Opposition 1
13.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.10.2007 Authorisation Opposition 1
12.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2007 Claims Opposition 1
14.08.2007 Claims Opposition 1
14.08.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
18.04.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.04.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.03.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
16.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
12.03.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 43
12.03.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
12.03.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 43
12.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.03.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
18.05.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.04.2006 Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase Search / examination 1
11.04.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.04.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.04.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
17.02.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.02.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.02.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
23.12.2005 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
13.12.2005 Description Search / examination 3
13.12.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.10.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.06.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.02.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.01.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
06.08.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
23.04.2004 Refund of fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.04.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
05.03.2004 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
05.03.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.03.2004 Refund of fees (PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.03.2004 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
31.12.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
31.12.2003 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 28
23.12.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.12.2003 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.11.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.07.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
17.07.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 4
17.07.2003 Description International Searching Authority 16
17.07.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 6
17.06.2003 Authorisation Search / examination 1
17.06.2003 General authorisation Search / examination 1