blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1536746 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1536746



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2033
31.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.10.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
27.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.10.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 37
20.10.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.10.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.07.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
13.07.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
11.07.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
05.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.07.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.07.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 57
04.07.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
04.07.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
28.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.06.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
22.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
09.06.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 29
09.06.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 18
09.06.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 27
09.06.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 3
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 3
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 3
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
09.06.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.06.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 56
09.06.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
09.06.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.06.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.06.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
02.02.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
02.02.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
31.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.01.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
18.01.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
13.01.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.12.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
16.11.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
16.11.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
10.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.11.2016 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
07.11.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
07.11.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
04.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
02.11.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
02.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
01.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.08.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.07.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
26.07.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
21.07.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.07.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
22.06.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
29.03.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
29.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 31
04.12.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.12.2015 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
02.12.2015 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 1
30.11.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
19.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.11.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 3
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Claims Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 32
13.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
07.10.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
29.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 1
25.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
18.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
11.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
07.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.09.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
20.08.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
03.08.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.08.2015 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2015 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
13.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 18
07.07.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
07.07.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 22
07.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Means of redress Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.07.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.06.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Claims Opposition 3
15.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.05.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
15.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
15.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
15.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
15.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 189
21.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2015 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
29.01.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
29.01.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
13.01.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.01.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Opposition 1
24.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
18.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 2
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 2
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 2
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.07.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
18.07.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 19
14.04.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
14.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.04.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
02.04.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.03.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
26.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
19.03.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.03.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.01.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.12.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
30.12.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
30.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.05.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.04.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.03.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
25.03.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
25.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.11.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.11.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.11.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.11.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
23.10.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
23.10.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.08.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.08.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.08.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.08.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
02.08.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
01.06.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
22.05.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 3
28.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.01.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.12.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
25.08.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.08.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
01.08.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
01.08.2011 Description Search / examination 10
01.08.2011 Description Search / examination 1
01.08.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.06.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.05.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
27.01.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.12.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
22.12.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
22.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
22.12.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.11.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.11.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.07.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
14.07.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.04.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
12.04.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
11.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
05.02.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.01.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.01.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
14.05.2009 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
01.12.2008 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
29.10.2008 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
20.10.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.09.2008 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
27.09.2008 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
11.10.2005 Annex Search / examination 10
11.10.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
11.10.2005 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
11.10.2005 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 2
30.09.2005 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 13
28.09.2005 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
27.09.2005 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
24.09.2005 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
23.09.2005 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
27.04.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.02.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
20.01.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
20.01.2005 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
20.01.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
05.11.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.08.2004 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
12.08.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.08.2004 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
31.12.2003 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 34