blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1536746


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
03.11.2017 Revocation of patent published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
16.10.2017 Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
13.07.2017 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
13.07.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.02.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
13.01.2017 Change: Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2017 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
15.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.12.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
27.11.2015 Change: Appeal number
16.11.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
09.10.2015 Change - representative
09.10.2015 Change - applicant published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
08.09.2015 Change: Appeal number
07.09.2015 New entry: Appeal number
07.09.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
17.08.2015 Change - representative
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
06.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
23.01.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
23.01.2015 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
23.01.2015 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
08.01.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
08.01.2015 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.07.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
04.04.2014 Change - representative published on  07.05.2014  [2014/19]
18.03.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
28.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Opposition filed published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
05.04.2013 (Expected) grant published on  08.05.2013  [2013/19]
03.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.11.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.11.2012 Change - inventor published on  19.12.2012  [2012/51]
19.10.2012 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.07.2012 Change - divisional application(s) published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
03.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2012 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
28.02.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.01.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.08.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.08.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.06.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.01.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.01.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.11.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.07.2010 First examination report
09.07.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.03.2010 Change - representative published on  21.04.2010  [2010/16]
12.03.2010 Change - representative published on  14.04.2010  [2010/15]
15.01.2010 Supplementary search report published on  17.02.2010  [2010/07]
15.01.2010 Change - classification published on  17.02.2010  [2010/07]
01.07.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2008 Change - applicant published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
17.10.2008 Change - applicant published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
17.10.2008 Change - inventor published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
04.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.07.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.10.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
20.10.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.10.2005 Change - withdrawal published on  23.11.2005  [2005/47]
30.09.2005 Withdrawal of application published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
27.08.2005 Change - extension states published on  12.10.2005  [2005/41]
30.07.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
22.04.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
22.04.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
22.04.2005 Request for examination filed published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
20.04.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
13.04.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
28.01.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
24.01.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
24.01.2005 Amendment by applicant
13.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
25.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
21.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
14.01.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2004 PCT data prior to European publication