blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1536746
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8257723Global Dossier 04.09.2012B2
US2010160711 24.06.2010A1
Priority number Date
US65150210 04.01.2010
US42766202 19.11.2002
US60252603 24.06.2003
US44414303 31.01.2003
US39102702 24.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7744913Global Dossier 29.06.2010B2
US2004094162 20.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US42766202 19.11.2002
US60252603 24.06.2003
US44414303 31.01.2003
US39102702 24.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1536746Global Dossier 08.05.2013B1
EP1536746 17.02.2010A4
EP1536746 08.06.2005A2
Priority number Date
US0319825 24.06.2003
US42766202 19.11.2002
US44414303 31.01.2003
US39102702 24.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003243755 06.01.2004A8
AU2003243755 06.01.2004A1
Priority number Date
US0319825 24.06.2003
US42766202 19.11.2002
US44414303 31.01.2003
US39102702 24.06.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2424348T 01.10.2013T3
Priority number Date
US0319825 24.06.2003
US42766202 19.11.2002
US44414303 31.01.2003
US39102702 24.06.2002
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2004000103Global Dossier 12.08.2004A3
WO2004000103 31.12.2003A2
Priority number Date
US42766202 19.11.2002
US44414303 31.01.2003
US39102702 24.06.2002
TypeType Divisional application
  Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 24.08.2012