blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1536746

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BGLapse: 08.05.2013
 CHLapse: 08.05.2013
CYLapse: 08.05.2013
 CZLapse: 08.05.2013
 DE 
 DKLapse: 08.05.2013
 EELapse: 08.05.2013
 ES 
 FILapse: 08.05.2013
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HULapse: 24.06.2003
 IELapse: 24.06.2013
 IT 
 LILapse: 08.05.2013
 LU 
 MCLapse: 08.05.2013
 NL 
 PTLapse: 09.09.2013
 ROLapse: 08.05.2013
 SE 
 SILapse: 08.05.2013
 SKLapse: 08.05.2013
 TR 
Examination procedure25.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase20.01.2005National basic fee paid 
20.01.2005Search fee paid 
20.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200503   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2005
European patent granted08.05.2013
Opposition procedure11.07.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 06.12.2017 
Appeal following opposition07.09.2015APPEAL FILED
13.11.2015APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
11.07.2017APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:08.06.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20050120
 
Event date:08.06.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:08.06.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Event date:12.10.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:16.11.2005 
Event description:APPLICATION WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20050923
 
Event date:23.11.2005 
Event description:APPLICATION WITHDRAWN (DELETED)
 
Event date:19.11.2008 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:INCEPT, LLC
 
Event date:19.11.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:NOYES, WILLIAM R.
 
Event date:31.12.2008 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:INCEPT, LLC
 
Event date:17.02.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61F 13/00 20060101AFI20050419BHEP
 
Event date:17.02.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61F 2/00 20060101ALI20100111BHEP
 
Event date:17.02.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61L 31/04 20060101ALI20100111BHEP
 
Event date:17.02.2010 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61L 31/14 20060101ALI20100111BHEP
 
Event date:17.02.2010 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20100119
 
Event date:18.08.2010 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20100714
 
Event date:19.12.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:NOYES, WILLIAM R.
 
Event date:08.05.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 610692 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20130515
 
Event date:19.06.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:04.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 60344003 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20130704
 
Event date:13.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:18.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:01.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2424348 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20131001
 
Event date:17.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20130401651 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20130920
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130909
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:29.11.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:19.02.2014 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:Q-MED AB
Effective DATE:20131230
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:27.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 60344003 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20131230
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130624
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:17.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20030624
 
Event date:11.11.2015 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:INCEPT, LLC
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20150707
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:06.01.2016 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:Q-MED AB
Effective DATE:20131230
 
Event date:23.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160630
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20161123
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20161128
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20161128
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20161129
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20161126
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20161123
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20161128
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20161124
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20161128
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Effective DATE:20161130
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20161128
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20161125
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:11.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R103 60344003 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENT REVOKED BY EPO
 
Event date:11.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R064 60344003 DE
Code Expl.:-EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL
 
Event date:15.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PLX
Code Expl.:-PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS
 
Event date:06.12.2017 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20170711
 
Event date:06.12.2017 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Effective DATE:20170711
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20171215
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:15.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MA03 610692 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE PATENT
Effective DATE:20170711
 
Event date:27.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE ECNC
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM THE REGISTER