Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1536746

EP1536746 - FILLERS AND METHODS FOR DISPLACING TISSUES TO IMPROVE RADIOLOGICAL OUTCOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 04.04.2018  [2018/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Incept, LLC
6 Porter Lane
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
[2015/46]
Former [2009/01]For all designated states
Incept, LLC
12 Idylwide Road
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Incept, LLC
12 Idylwilde Road
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
Former [2005/23]For all designated states
Noyes, William R.
3501 Norkota Court
Grand Forks, ND 58210 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Noyes, William R.
3501 Norkota Court
Grand Forks, ND 58210 / US
 [2012/51]
Former [2008/47]01 / Noyes, William R.
Norkota Court
Grand Forks, ND 58210 / US
Former [2005/23]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Finnie, Isobel Lara , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2013/19]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2005/23]Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date03761283.524.06.2003
[2005/23]
WO2003US19825
Priority number, dateUS20020391027P24.06.2002         Original published format: US 391027 P
US20020427662P19.11.2002         Original published format: US 427662 P
US20030444143P31.01.2003         Original published format: US 444143 P
[2005/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004000103
Date:31.12.2003
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1536746
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003
[2005/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1536746
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.08.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61F2/00, A61L31/04, A61L31/14
[2010/07]
Former International [2005/23]A61F13/00, A61F2/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/23]
TitleGerman:FÜLLSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERDRÄNGUNG VON GEWEBE ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES RADIOLOGISCHEN RESULTATS[2005/23]
English:FILLERS AND METHODS FOR DISPLACING TISSUES TO IMPROVE RADIOLOGICAL OUTCOMES[2005/23]
French:AGENTS DE REMPLISSAGE ET PROCEDES POUR DEPLACER DES TISSUS POUR AMELIORER LES RESULTATS RADIOLOGIQUES[2005/23]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2005National basic fee paid 
20.01.2005Search fee paid 
20.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/23]
23.09.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/46]
deletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/47]
14.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2012Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2013Fee for grant paid
25.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12177496.2   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 24.08.2012
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.12.2013  29.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Q-Med AB
Seminariegatan 21
752 28 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2013  29.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Q-Med AB
Seminariegatan 21
752 28 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  30.12.2013   
Q-Med AB
Seminariegatan 21
752 28 Uppsala / SE
Opponent's representative
Henriksson, Mikael
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
19.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
07.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
11.07.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/49]
Appeal following opposition07.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1758/15
13.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
11.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
08.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
11.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200503   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.06.2003
BG08.05.2013
CH08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LI08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE24.06.2013
PT09.09.2013
[2018/14]
Former [2017/10]HU24.06.2003
BG08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE24.06.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2017/03]HU24.06.2003
BG08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE24.06.2013
PT09.09.2013
BE30.06.2016
Former [2015/34]HU24.06.2003
BG08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE24.06.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2015/23]CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE24.06.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/20]CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE24.06.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/14]CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/09]CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/52]CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/47]PT09.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6206930  (BURG KAREN J L [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,9,11-12,14-17,19,22-27,29-30 * column 3, lines 45-61 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 42 * * column 7, lines 8-36 * * column 8, lines 13-34 * * column 9, lines 17-46 * [I] 6,8,13;
 [X]WO9959501  (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 1,7,9-10,15-22,24-25,28-30 * page 2, lines 19-24 * * page 4, lines 7-24 * * page 8, lines 4-26 * * claims 1-16 *;
 [E]CA2188464  (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]) [E] 1-4,7-8,11-13 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 4 * * claims 1-7,15 *
International search[Y]US5499994  ;
 [Y]US5629008  ;
 [Y]US6545097
ExaminationDE4414755
by applicantWO9959501
 US6206930