blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1517619

EP1517619 - SATIETY INDUCING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): ES, TR
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HU  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  RO  SE  SK  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HU  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  RO  SE  SK  TR 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2007/01]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HU  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  RO  SE  SK  TR 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Former [2005/13]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HU  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT  RO  SE  SK  TR 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE 
Unilever Plc
Unilever House, Blackfriars
London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / GERHARDT, Cinderella, C. UNILEVER R & D VLAARDINGEN
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
02 / TASKER, Maria, Catherine Unilever R&D Vlaardingen
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 [2005/13]
Representative(s)Wurfbain, Gilles L., et al
Unilever N.V.
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Wurfbain, Gilles L., et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2006/16]Wurfbain, Gilles L., et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2006/03]Hodgetts, Catherine Dawn, et al
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2005/13]Hodgetts, Catherine Dawn
Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date03761459.113.06.2003
[2005/13]
WO2003EP06212
Priority number, dateEP2002025462201.07.2002         Original published format: EP 02254622
[2005/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004002241
Date:08.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1517619
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1517619
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:A23L1/305, A23L1/29, A23L2/66, A23J3/34
[2005/13]
CPC:
A23L33/19 (EP,US); A23L33/18 (EP,US); A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP); A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
C-Set:
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54252, A23V2250/2482, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/032 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54252, A23V2250/5036, A23V2200/044, A23V2250/18, A23V2250/628 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/13]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE EIN SÄTTIGUNGSGEFÜHL HERVORRUFT[2005/13]
English:SATIETY INDUCING COMPOSITION[2005/13]
French:COMPOSITION INDUISANT LA SATIETE[2005/13]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2004National basic fee paid 
24.11.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/13]
23.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2006Fee for grant paid
31.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.10.2007  20.11.2007  ADMISSIBLE
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2007/46]
Opponent(s)01  03.10.2007   
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
27.02.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.08.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.03.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.09.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
08.09.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/14]
08.09.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.05.2010Appeal received No.  T1111/10
09.07.2010Statement of grounds filed
08.09.2010Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
LU13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
HU04.07.2007
GB13.06.2010
IT13.06.2010
TR13.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
[2015/21]
Former [2011/35]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
LU13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
HU04.07.2007
GB13.06.2010
IT13.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
Former [2011/31]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
LU13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
HU04.07.2007
IT13.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
Former [2011/24]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
LU13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
HU04.07.2007
IT13.06.2010
FR30.06.2010
Former [2011/22]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
LU13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
HU04.07.2007
IT13.06.2010
Former [2011/14]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
LU13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
HU04.07.2007
IT13.06.2010
Former [2009/43]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
LU13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
HU04.07.2007
Former [2009/39]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
LU13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
Former [2009/34]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
Former [2009/11]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
EE03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
Former [2008/25]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE13.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
Former [2008/09]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
MC30.06.2007
Former [2008/04]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
RO03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2008/01]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CZ03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/51]AT03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SK03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/47]AT03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
DK03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
SI03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/41]CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
BG04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9949741  (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [DX] 13-18 * page 4, paragraph 4; example - * * page 6, paragraph 4 *;
 [DX]EP1034704  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [DX] 13-15,17,18 * paragraph [0018]; example - *;
 [DX]US6207638  (PORTMAN ROBERT [US]) [DX] 1,2,6-12 * column 7, lines 37-53; claim 1 * * column 9, lines 18-59 *;
 [XD]WO0143563  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [XD] 13-15,17,18 * example 2 *;
 WO0215719  [ ] (NESTLE SA [CH]);
 [DX]US2002044988  (FUCHS EILEEN C [US], et al) [DX] 13-18 * paragraph [0003]; examples 1,2,7; claims 1,2,15,16 *;
 [XD]EP1201137  (CAMPINA MELKUNIE BV [NL]) [XD] 1-7* examples 7,8 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.