Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1517619 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1517619



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 669
10.09.2018 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
06.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
25.02.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
05.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.09.2010 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 4
21.09.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 6
11.08.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.08.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.07.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.07.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.07.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 38
09.07.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
01.06.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
19.05.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.05.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.03.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
18.03.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.03.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.03.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.12.2009 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.11.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2009 Claims Opposition 3
06.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.11.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
05.11.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.11.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.11.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.11.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.11.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
18.03.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.01.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.01.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
28.01.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.01.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2008 Claims Opposition 2
22.08.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
04.07.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
09.06.2008 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.02.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.02.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.11.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.10.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 9
03.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
03.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
03.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
03.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.12.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.08.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.08.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
31.08.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.05.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.05.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.05.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
28.04.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.03.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.03.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.03.2006 Description Search / examination 30
06.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.02.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
30.11.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.11.2005 Request for change of address Search / examination 26
16.11.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.11.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
01.10.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
29.09.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.06.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.02.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.02.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
03.12.2004 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
03.12.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
24.11.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.11.2004 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.11.2004 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.11.2004 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.08.2004 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
17.08.2004 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.08.2004 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.08.2004 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.08.2004 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.08.2004 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.08.2004 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
17.08.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.08.2004 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.07.2004 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.06.2004 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.06.2004 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
21.06.2004 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.06.2004 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.06.2004 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.06.2004 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.06.2004 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
21.05.2004 Grant of extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 40
13.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.02.2004 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.02.2004 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
19.02.2004 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
28.01.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.01.2004 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
08.01.2004 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 36
20.12.2003 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.12.2003 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
23.07.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
23.07.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 4
23.07.2003 Description International Searching Authority 30
23.07.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 2