Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1517652

EP1517652 - THORACIC INTRODUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2012
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
750 North Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
For all designated states
William A. Cook Australia Pty. Ltd.
12 Electronics Street, Brisbane Technology Park Eight Mile Plains, Brisbane
Queensland 4113 / AU
[2012/04]
Former [2011/43]For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
P.O. Box 2269
Bloomington, IN 47402 / US
For all designated states
William A. Cook Australia Pty. Ltd.
12 Electronics Street, Brisbane Technology Park Eight Mile Plains, Brisbane
Queensland 4113 / AU
Former [2005/13]For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
750 North Daniels Way P.O. BOX 489
Bloomington, Indiana 47402-0489 / US
For all designated states
William A. Cook Australia Pty. Ltd.
12 Electronics Street, Brisbane Technology Park
Eight Mile Plains, Brisbane, Queensland 4113 / AU
For all designated states
WILLIAM COOK EUROPE A/S
Sandet 6
4632 Bjaeverskov / DK
Inventor(s)01 / GREENBERG, Roy, K.
1 Shoreby Drive
Bratenahl, OH 44108 / US
02 / HARTLEY, David, Ernest
2 View Street
Subiaco, Western Australia 6008 / AU
03 / RASMUSSEN, Erik, E.
Vesterhaven 1
DK-4200 Slagelse / DK
 [2005/13]
Representative(s)Jehan, Robert , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/13]Jehan, Robert , et al
Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2BP / GB
Application number, filing date03762267.730.06.2003
[2005/13]
WO2003US20651
Priority number, dateUS20020392599P28.06.2002         Original published format: US 392599 P
[2005/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004002371
Date:08.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1517652
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004
[2005/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1517652
Date:07.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2005/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/13]
TitleGerman:THORAX-EINFÜHRINSTRUMENT[2005/13]
English:THORACIC INTRODUCER[2005/13]
French:INTRODUCTEUR THORACIQUE[2005/13]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2004National basic fee paid 
01.12.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/13]
14.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2011Fee for grant paid
18.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.02.2011
Opposition(s)10.09.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
07.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.06.2003
AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
LU30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
LU30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2014/21]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
TR07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2013/29]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
FI07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2013/23]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FR02.07.2012
Former [2013/22]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
ES18.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/20]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/08]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/07]AT07.12.2011
BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2012/37]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
PT09.04.2012
Former [2012/36]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
RO07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
SK07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/35]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
EE07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
BG07.03.2012
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/34]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
CZ07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/30]BE07.12.2011
CY07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/28]CY07.12.2011
SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Former [2012/24]SE07.12.2011
SI07.12.2011
GR08.03.2012
Cited inInternational search[YA]US6346118  (BAKER STEVE G [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-16,18,25,26,31,32 * column W * [A] 19,20;
 [Y]US5147334  (MOSS JAMES P) [Y] 1,2,5-7,9,10,12-16,18,25,26,31,32 * figure - *
by applicantUS5387235
 US5720776
 US6206931
 WO9853761
 WO9929262
 WO03034948