Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1522168

EP1522168 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTERIZED MEDIUM FOR MAKING SECURE MESSAGE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2010
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Algoril Holding SA
Hänibüel 8
6300 Zoug / CH
[2009/28]
Former [2005/15]For all designated states
Suanez, Roger
36, rue du Bois
44510 Le Pouliguen / FR
For all designated states
Etienne, Patricia
36, rue du Bois
44510 Le Pouliguen / FR
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2005/15]
Representative(s)Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie , et al
SCHMIT CHRETIEN
16, Rue de la Paix
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie , et al
SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN 16 rue de la Paix
75002 Paris / FR
Former [2008/12]Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie , et al
SCHMIT CHRETIEN SCHIHIN SNC 16, rue de la Paix
75002 Paris / FR
Former [2005/15]Arnaud, Jean
Lerner et Associés, 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date03762734.604.07.2003
[2005/15]
WO2003FR02074
Priority number, dateFR2002000841804.07.2002         Original published format: FR 0208418
[2005/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004006498
Date:15.01.2004
Language:FR
[2004/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1522168
Date:13.04.2005
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004
[2005/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1522168
Date:26.08.2009
Language:FR
[2009/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32
[2005/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND DATENTRÄGER ZUR SICHERUNG EINER NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNG[2005/15]
English:METHOD, SYSTEM AND COMPUTERIZED MEDIUM FOR MAKING SECURE MESSAGE TRANSMISSION[2005/15]
French:PROCEDE, SYSTEME ET SUPPORT INFORMATIQUE DE SECURISATION DE TRANSMISSION DE MESSAGES[2005/15]
Entry into regional phase27.01.2005National basic fee paid 
27.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
27.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/15]
03.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2009Fee for grant paid
09.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
07.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
08.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IE26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
TR26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
HU27.02.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IE26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
HU27.02.2010
Former [2011/14]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IE26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/48]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IE26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/23]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IE26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/22]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IE26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
RO26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/20]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IE26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/19]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/18]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/16]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/11]AT26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
SI26.08.2009
Former [2010/10]AT26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
NL26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
Former [2010/09]AT26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
Former [2010/08]AT26.08.2009
SE26.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2002023221  (MIYAZAKI KUNIHIKO ET AL) [X] 1,17,19 * paragraph [0005]; figures 4,5,15 * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * [A] 2;
 [X]US6163842  (BARTON JAMES M) [X] 1,2,17,19 * column 1, line 25 - line 43 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 23 * * column 4, line 21 - line 35 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 32 * * column 7, line 55 - line 64 * * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 10 *;
 [PA]WO02054667  (SUANEZ ROGER ;ETIENNE PATRICIA (FR)) [PA] 3,23 * abstract *;
 [A]US6108783  (KRAWCZYK HUGO MARIO ET AL) [A] 3 * column 8, line 31 - line 38; claim 14 *
 [A]  - DAVIES & W PRICE D, SECURITY FOR COMPUTER NETWORKS, SECURITY FOR COMPUTER NETWORKS. INTRODUCTION TO DATA SECURITY IN TELEPROCESSING AND ELECTRONIC FUNDS TRANSFER, CHICHESTER, WILEY & SONS, GB, PAGE(S) 252-281, (1989), XP002150682 [A] 1 * page 261, paragraph L - page 262, paragraph 1 *