Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1535177

EP1535177 - METHOD FOR CACHING AND DELIVERY OF COMPRESSED CONTENT IN A CONTENT DELIVERY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akamai Technologies, Inc.
8 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
[2005/22]
Inventor(s)01 / AFERGAN, Michael, M.
125 Hampshire Street, 2
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / SCHLOSSBERG, Charisma
22 Thurston Road 2
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
03 / HONG, Duke, P.
415 S. Tremont Street
Oceanside, CA 92054 / US
04 / RAO, Satish, Balusu
2421 Oregon Street
Berkeley, CA 94705-1113 / US
 [2005/22]
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[2017/34]
Former [2008/35]Lawrence, Malcolm Graham , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2005/22]Lawrence, Malcolm Graham
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date03764529.811.07.2003
[2005/22]
WO2003US21760
Priority number, dateUS2002019404311.07.2002         Original published format: US 194043
[2005/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004008334
Date:22.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1535177
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004
[2005/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1535177
Date:23.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.01.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, G06F15/16, G06F17/30
[2017/12]
Former International [2008/23]G06F15/16, // H04L29/06
Former International [2005/22]G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/34]
Former [2005/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL11.01.2005
LT11.01.2005
LV11.01.2005
MK11.01.2005
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR CACHE-SPEICHERUNG UND ABLIEFERUNG VON KOMPRIMIERTEM INHALT IN EINEM INHALTSABLIEFERUNGSNETZWERK[2005/22]
English:METHOD FOR CACHING AND DELIVERY OF COMPRESSED CONTENT IN A CONTENT DELIVERY NETWORK[2005/22]
French:PROCEDE DE MISE EN MEMOIRE CACHE ET DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN CONTENU COMPRIME DANS UN RESEAU DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU[2005/22]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2005National basic fee paid 
11.01.2005Search fee paid 
11.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/22]
21.03.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2017Fee for grant paid
16.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2010
Opposition(s)24.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
19.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
20.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
17.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
12.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
02.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
15.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
13.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
[2019/15]
Former [2018/40]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
Former [2018/09]FI23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
Former [2018/08]FI23.08.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0163485  (TRANSFINITY CORP [US]; LIU SHIN PING [US]; TUCKER DENNIS [US] TRANSFIN) [X] 15 * page 10, line 11 - page 16, line 2 * * page 22, line 21 - page 25, line 21 * * claims 1-4 * [Y] 1-6,10-12,14;
 [XY]US2002056010  (LINCOLN PATRICK D [US] ET AL) [X] 15 * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] * [Y] 1-6,10-12,14
International search[X]US2001029544  (COUSINS ROBERT E [US]);
 [X]US2002059463  (GOLDSTEIN LEONID [US]);
 [A]US5978841  (BERGER LOUIS [US])
by applicantWO0163485
 US2002056010