blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1572711

EP1572711 - ANHYDROUS CRYSTALLINE AZIDO CYTOSINE HEMISULFATE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2010
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2009/19]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / CONNOLLY, Terrence Joseph
777 West Middlefield Road, Apartment 64
Moutain View, CA 95051 / US
02 / MARTIN, Joseph Armstrong
10 The Chowns, West Common
Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2BN / GB
03 / PRINCE, Anthony
36 Farm Road
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
04 / SARMA, Keshab
517 Davenport Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Rauber, Beat, et al
124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basle / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/37]Rauber, Beat, et al
124 Grenzacherstrasse
4070 Basle / CH
Application number, filing date03767770.508.12.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003EP13899
Priority number, dateUS20020431885P09.12.2002         Original published format: US 431885 P
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004052906
Date:24.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1572711
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1572711
Date:06.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.2004
ClassificationIPC:C07H19/06, A61K31/7068, A61P31/12
[2005/37]
CPC:
C07H19/06 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/7068 (KR); A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP); A61P31/12 (EP); A61P31/14 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LT11.07.2005
LV11.07.2005
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASSERFREIES KRISTALLINES AZIDOCYTOSIN-HEMISULFAT-DERIVAT[2005/37]
English:ANHYDROUS CRYSTALLINE AZIDO CYTOSINE HEMISULFATE DERIVATIVE[2005/37]
French:DERIVE D'HEMISULFATE D'AZIDO CYTOSINE CRISTALLIN ANHYDRE[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2005National basic fee paid 
11.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
28.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2009Fee for grant paid
24.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.02.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]  - R.T. WALKER ET AL. (EDS), J.G. MOFFATT, Nucleoside analogues. Chemistry, Biology and Medical Applications, NEW YORK, PLENUM PRESS, (1979), XP008029803 [AD] 1,9 * page 144 *
 [AD]  - H. MAAG ET AL., "Synthesis and anti-HIV activity of 4'-azido- and 4'-methoxynucleosides", J. MED. CHEM., (1992), vol. 35, pages 1440 - 1451, XP002277180 [AD] 1,9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00086a013
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.