EP1576468 - ENCAPSULATED HARDWARE CONFIGURATION/CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Partners for Corporate Research International Clifton House 75 Fort Street P.O. Box 1350 George Town Grand Cayman KY1-1108 / KY | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Partners for Corporate Research International a Cayman Islands Company Clifton House 75 Fort Street P.O. Box 1350 George Town Grand Cayman KY1-1108 / KY | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Partners for Corporate Research International a Cayman Islands Company Clifton House 75 Fort Street P.O. Box 1350 George Town Grand Cayman KY1-1108 / KY | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOFF, Lonnie 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | O'Callaghan, Robert James, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP BV Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2009/44] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/14] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/01] | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/38] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03768034.5 | 17.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003IB06008 | Priority number, date | US20020434738P | 18.12.2002 Original published format: US 434738 P | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004055668 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1576468 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
G06F11/2289 (EP,US);
G06F13/28 (EP);
G06F13/385 (EP);
G06F9/4411 (EP,US);
G06F9/44505 (EP);
G06F9/4498 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/38] | G06F9/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERUNG UND STEUERUNG VON EINGEKAPSELTER HARDWARE | [2005/38] | English: | ENCAPSULATED HARDWARE CONFIGURATION/CONTROL | [2005/38] | French: | CONFIGURATION/COMMANDE DE MATERIEL ENCAPSULE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.05.2023 | 25.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/46] | 08.07.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/46] | Appeal following examination | 29.09.2014 | Appeal received No. T2296/14 | 28.11.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.05.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2013 | 31.12.2022 | 20   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0661850 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5812867 (BASSET PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - line 27 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 26 * * column 7, line 28 - line 50 ** figures 1,3 *; | [A]US6222757 (RAU PRASAD [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 19 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 37 *; | [X]US6240496 (NYLUND HELGE [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0215473 (MICROCHIP TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * page 22, line 7 - page 25, line 18 * * figures 5-7 * * page 15, line 19 - page 19, line 2 * |