Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1561023

EP1561023 - MULTI-PART COOLED PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.04.2011
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
17.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE GMBH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Volvo Powertrain Corporation
405 08 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
Hirschvogel Umformtechnik GmbH
Mühlstrasse 6
86920 Denklingen / DE
[2011/21]
Former [2005/32]For all designated states
Mahle GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Volvo Powertrain Corporation
405 08 Göteborg / SE
For all designated states
Hirschvogel Umformtechnik GmbH
Mühlstrasse 6
86920 Denklingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BERR, Gerhard
Fliederstrasse 4/1
71546 Aspach / DE
02 / RANVENSHORST, Henk
Klagshamnsgatan 1
S-421 66 Västra Frölunda / SE
03 / IHLE, Armin
Falkenhöfle 3a
86925 Asch / DE
04 / HORN, Magnus
Annelundsvägen 11
S-429 42 Särö / SE
05 / LUNDIN, Lars
Västra Skansgatan 1B
S-413 02 Göteborg / SE
 [2005/32]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/35]Winter, Martina , et al
Patentanwältin WinterLewandowsky Kirchstrasse 4/6
71364 Winnenden / DE
Former [2008/35]Pohle, Reinhard
Mahle International GmbH Patentabteilung ZRIP Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2005/32]Pohle, Reinhard
Mahle GmbH Patentabteilung ZRIP Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date03769203.519.09.2003
[2005/32]
WO2003DE03117
Priority number, dateDE2002104451325.09.2002         Original published format: DE 10244513
[2005/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004029441
Date:08.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1561023
Date:10.08.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004
[2005/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1561023
Date:25.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:F02F3/00, F02F3/22
[2005/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2006/03]
Former [2005/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRTEILIGEN GEKÜHLTEN KOLBEN FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2005/32]
English:MULTI-PART COOLED PISTON FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[2005/32]
French:PISTON REFROIDI COMPOSE DE PLUSIEURS PARTIES POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE[2005/32]
Entry into regional phase22.04.2005National basic fee paid 
22.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/32]
02.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2011Fee for grant paid
01.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.02.2012   
KS Kolbenschmidt GmbH
Karl-Schmidt-Strasse
74172 Neckarsulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Greif, Thomas
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/14]
Opponent(s)01  24.02.2012   
KS Kolbenschmidt GmbH
Karl-Schmidt-Strasse
74172 Neckarsulm / DE
Opponent's representative
Greif, Thomas
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Rheinmetall Platz 1
DE-40476 Düsseldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.04.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.06.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.06.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
24.08.2012Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
07.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
29.02.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.10.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition22.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0019/17
24.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
23.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[Y]US6260472  (ZHU XILUO ET AL) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 2, line 44 - column 2, line 60; figure - * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 37 *;
 [Y]US5150517  (DELLANOCE PAULO T ET AL) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 2, line 23 - column 2, line 58; figure - *;
 [YA]EP0464626  (KOLBENSCHMIDT AG) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 29; figure - * [A] 3,7;
 [YA]US2334318  (SHEARMAN DONALDSON JOHN) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * page 3, column L, line 37 - page 3, column L, line 40 * * page 3, column L, line 14 - page 3, column L, line 20 * [A] 3,7;
 [A]US5778846  (MIELKE SIEGFRIED) [A] 4,8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE20007415U  (MAHLE GMBH) [A] 1,9 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 2 *