blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1563371

EP1563371 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AND/OR CONFIGURING AN AUTOMATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  25.12.2015
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 27.01.2016  [2016/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
[2013/11]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BIEBER, Jürgen
Neisseweg 3
76275 Ettlingen / DE
 [2005/33]
Application number, filing date03769220.926.09.2003
[2005/33]
WO2003DE03218
Priority number, dateDE200215317414.11.2002         Original published format: DE 10253174
[2005/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004044739
Date:27.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1563371
Date:17.08.2005
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.2004
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/44, G06F17/30
[2005/33]
CPC:
G06F8/71 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/10]
Former [2005/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTWICKLUNG UND/ODER KONFIGURATION EINES AUTOMATISIERUNGSSYSTEMS[2005/33]
English:DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AND/OR CONFIGURING AN AUTOMATION SYSTEM[2005/33]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR ELABORER ET/OU CONFIGURER UN SYSTEME D'AUTOMATISATION[2005/33]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2005National basic fee paid 
27.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/33]
04.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.11.2015
09.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/04]
19.09.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/04]
05.11.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.08.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
19.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
18.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
19.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
06.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
18.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
19.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201513   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US6151609  (TRUONG TIMOTHY M [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5 * * column 2, lines 17-40 * * column 3, lines 11-47 * * column 6, lines 4-44,59,60 * * column 8, lines 17-19,26-67 * * column 10, lines 46-58 *;
 [A]WO0173546  (SIEMENS ENERGY & AUTOMAT [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, lines 18-22 * * page 4, lines 1-19 * * page 5, lines 1-3 * * page 6, lines 5-19 * * page 8, lines 1-19 *;
 [A]DE19926370  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-31,46-53 * * column 2, lines 32-51 * * column 3, lines 5-15 *;
 [A]US6134552  (FRITZ FRANZ-JOSEPH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 20-26 * * column 2, lines 15-23,38-65 * * column 1, lines 1-4 * * column 4, lines 28-46 * * column 5, lines 1-10,36-67 * * column 6, lines 1-10,29-42,63-65 * * column 7, lines 1-5 * * column 9, lines 34-36,52-54 *;
 [A]US2002077933  (DUTTA RABINDRANATH [US], et al) [A] 6,7 * paragraphs [0019] , [0038] *
 [A]  - PAOLI J, "Cooperative work on the network: edit the WWW!", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950401), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 841 - 847, XP004013186 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 844, column L * * page 844, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00034-5
 [A]  - CHRISTEL M G ET AL, "SVG for navigating digital news video", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 9TH. ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA. OTTAWA, CANADA, SEPT. 30 - OCT. 5, 2001, ACM INTERNATIONAL MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: ACM, US, (20010930), vol. CONF. 9, ISBN 1-58113-394-4, pages 483 - 485, XP002250552 [A] 6,7 * page 483, column R, paragraph L * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/500141.500218
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.