blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1572200

EP1572200 - AMINOINDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF AS KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aventis Pharma S.A.
20, avenue Raymond Aron
92160 Antony / FR
[2005/37]
Inventor(s)01 / LESUISSE, Dominique
11 rue des Fédérés
F-93100 MONTREUIL / FR
02 / DUTRUC-ROSSET, Gilles
21 Avenue du Docteur Arnold Netter
F-75012 PARIS / FR
03 / HALLEY, Franck
26 rue de la Borne du Diable
F-92310 SEVRES / FR
04 / BABIN, Didier
22 rue de la Grenouillette
F-78180 MONTIGNY / FR
05 / ROONEY, Thomas
2 Place du Champ des Cordes
F-91400 ORSAY / FR
06 / TIRABOSCHI, Gilles
17 rue Armand Cachat
F-91230 MONTGERON / FR
 [2006/52]
Former [2005/37]01 / LESUISSE, Dominique
11 rue des Fédérés
F-93100 MONTREUIL / FR
02 / DUTRUC-ROSSET, Gilles
21 Avenue du Docteur Arnold Netter
F-75012 PARIS / FR
03 / HALLEY, Franck
26 rue de la Borne du Diable
F-92310 SEVRES / FR
04 / BABIN, Didier
22 rue de la Grenouillette
F-78180 MONTIGNY / FR
05 / ROONEY, Thomas
2 Place du Champ des Cordes
F-91400 ORSAY / FR
06 / TIRABOSCHI, Gilles
31 rue Albert Thuret
F-94550 CHEVILLY LARUE / FR
Representative(s)Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P.
Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/19]Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P.
Nony & Associés 3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2005/37]Rousseau, Pierrick Edouard
Aventis Pharma S.A. Département des Brevets 20 Avenue Raymond Aron
F-92165 Antony Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date03769560.803.09.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003FR02634
Priority number, dateFR2002001572012.12.2002         Original published format: FR 0215720
US20030444630P04.02.2003         Original published format: US 444630 P
[2011/14]
Former [2005/37]WO2002FR1572012.12.2002
US20030444630P04.02.2003
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004062662
Date:29.07.2004
Language:FR
[2004/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1572200
Date:14.09.2005
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1572200
Date:17.08.2011
Language:FR
[2011/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.2004
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/416, C07D231/56, A61P25/00
[2005/37]
CPC:
C07D231/56 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/416 (EP,US); A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,US); A61K31/427 (EP,US); A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US); A61K31/5377 (EP,US); A61K31/541 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP); C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
Extension statesAL12.07.2005
LT12.07.2005
LV12.07.2005
MK12.07.2005
TitleGerman:AMINOINDAZOLE DERIVATE ALS KINASE INHIBITOREN[2005/37]
English:AMINOINDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF AS KINASE INHIBITORS[2005/37]
French:DERIVES D'AMINOINDAZOLES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEURS DE KINASES[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2005National basic fee paid 
12.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
15.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2011Fee for grant paid
27.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2005
Opposition(s)21.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.05.2009Request for further processing filed
07.05.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.05.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
HU17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
TR17.08.2011
LU03.09.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FR17.10.2011
BG17.11.2011
GB17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
ES28.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
DE03.04.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
TR17.08.2011
LU03.09.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FR17.10.2011
BG17.11.2011
GB17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
ES28.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
DE03.04.2012
Former [2013/29]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
LU03.09.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FR17.10.2011
BG17.11.2011
GB17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
ES28.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
DE03.04.2012
Former [2013/25]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
LU03.09.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FR17.10.2011
GB17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
ES28.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
DE03.04.2012
Former [2013/22]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FR17.10.2011
GB17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
ES28.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
DE03.04.2012
Former [2012/46]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FR17.10.2011
GB17.11.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
DE03.04.2012
Former [2012/37]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
FR17.10.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
DE03.04.2012
Former [2012/34]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
DE03.04.2012
Former [2012/33]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
DK17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/30]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/23]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
EE17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
IT17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
RO17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
SK17.08.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/21]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
CZ17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/20]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
IE17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT17.08.2011
CY17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT17.08.2011
FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
SI17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/10]FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
SE17.08.2011
GR18.11.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI17.08.2011
NL17.08.2011
PT19.12.2011
Former [2012/08]NL17.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[E]WO03028720  (PHARMACIA ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [E] 1-13 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO0222601  (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * claim 1 *
by applicantWO0222601
 WO03028720
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.