Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1559772

EP1559772 - LUBRICATING OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
[2013/17]
Former [2013/10]For all designated states
Nippon Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
Former [2005/31]For all designated states
Nippon Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ARIMOTO, Naozumi, @c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION
8, Chidori-cho
Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
02 / OKAWA, Tetsuo, @c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION
8, Chidori-cho
Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
 [2013/10]
Former [2005/31]01 / ARIMOTO, Naozumi, c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
02 / OKAWA, Tetsuo, c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2008/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2005/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03770108.331.10.2003
[2005/31]
WO2003JP14032
Priority number, dateJP2002032175405.11.2002         Original published format: JP 2002321754
[2005/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004041977
Date:21.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1559772
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004
[2005/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1559772
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.05.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:C10M161/00, C10M133/00, C10M143/00, C10M145/10, C10M149/00, // C10N20/02, C10N20/04, C10N30/06
[2008/36]
Former International [2005/31]C10M161/00, // (C10M161/00, 133:00, 143:00, 145:10, 149:00, C10N20:02, 20:04, 30:06, 40:04)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/31]
TitleGerman:SCHMIERÖL[2005/31]
English:LUBRICATING OIL[2005/31]
French:HUILE LUBRIFIANTE[2005/31]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2005Translation filed 
11.05.2005National basic fee paid 
11.05.2005Search fee paid 
11.05.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/31]
31.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2013Fee for grant paid
17.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.10.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Afton Chemical Corporation
500 Spring Street Richmond
VA 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP, et al
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/44]
Opponent(s)01  06.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Afton Chemical Corporation
500 Spring Street Richmond
VA 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp, et al
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2014/03]
Opponent(s)01  06.12.2013  11.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Afton Chemical Corporation
500 Spring Street Richmond
VA 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al
Mendelsohn, Drucker and Dunleavy, P.C.
p/o De Vries & Metman
Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
15.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.01.2016
19.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.08.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2251/16
15.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
30.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.10.2003
AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH31.10.2013
IE31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
LU31.10.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH31.10.2013
IE31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/48]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH31.10.2013
IE31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/34]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/25]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
MC06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2014/11]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
IT06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2014/09]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
DK06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CY06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
CZ06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
RO06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
SK06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
EE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
NL06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/47]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
PT08.07.2013
Former [2013/44]AT06.03.2013
BE06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT06.03.2013
FI06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
SI06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
GR07.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT06.03.2013
SE06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
ES17.06.2013
Former [2013/34]SE06.03.2013
BG06.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0071646  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 6, lines 21-26; examples 9-12 *
International search[Y]EP0949319  (NIPPON MITSUBISHI OIL CORP [JP]);
 [Y]EP1118654  (NIPPON MITSUBISHI OIL CORP [JP]);
 [Y]EP0699738  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP])
by applicantWO0071646
 EP1118654