Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1559772 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1559772



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 982
08.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.12.2019 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.11.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.11.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
22.11.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
19.11.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.11.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
09.10.2018 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
09.10.2018 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
02.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.10.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
02.10.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.09.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.08.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Appeal 1
28.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Claims Appeal 3
28.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.04.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.04.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 38
02.01.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.12.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
15.12.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.12.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 26
18.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.10.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.10.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.09.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.09.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
05.08.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
05.08.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
05.08.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.08.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
05.08.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.08.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.07.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
12.07.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
01.07.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 2
20.06.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.05.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.05.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 21
20.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
09.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.05.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.04.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.04.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
15.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.04.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.04.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.03.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.02.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.02.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.01.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.01.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
12.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
04.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.12.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 14
15.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.12.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
20.11.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.05.2015 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
21.04.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.04.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
21.04.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
05.08.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Claims Opposition 3
23.07.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
15.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.05.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.02.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
11.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.02.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
15.01.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.01.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
18.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.12.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.12.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
06.12.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.12.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
21.03.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.02.2013 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
07.02.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.01.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
17.01.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
17.01.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.09.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.09.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
11.06.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
11.06.2012 Description Search / examination 13
11.06.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.04.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
11.04.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
29.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.03.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.10.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.10.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.08.2008 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.07.2008 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
22.06.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.06.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
11.05.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.05.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
11.05.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
11.05.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
11.05.2005 Description Search / examination 32
11.05.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.03.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.06.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
21.05.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.05.2004 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
21.05.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 24