blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1569728

EP1569728 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE NATURE OF A BLOW AND MEASURING ITS FORCE, METHOD FOR USING SAME AND USE THEREOF FOR REFEREEING A SPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Desroses, Michel
19, allée des Commerces
77200 Torcy / FR
For all designated states
Venkiah, Christian
5 avenue Ferdinand Buisson
75016 Paris / FR
[2005/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2005/36]
Representative(s)Daudens, Michèle
2A, avenue de la Dame Blanche
94420 Le Plessis-Trévise / FR
[2007/47]
Former [2005/36]Daudens, Michèle
17, route de Neuilly
93160 Noisy-le-Grand / FR
Application number, filing date03771133.011.07.2003
[2005/36]
WO2003FR02186
Priority number, dateFR2002000935824.07.2002         Original published format: FR 0209358
[2005/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004011106
Date:05.02.2004
Language:FR
[2004/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1569728
Date:07.09.2005
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2004
ClassificationIPC:A63B69/00, G08B13/24, A42B3/04, A63B71/06
[2005/36]
CPC:
A63B71/0605 (EP,US); A63B69/32 (EP,US); A63B2209/08 (EP,US);
A63B2220/53 (EP,US); A63B2220/801 (EP,US); A63B2244/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG DER ART EINES SCHLAGS UND ZUR MESSUNG SEINER WUCHT, VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE VERWENDUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG DURCH SCHIEDSRICHTER BEI EINEM SPORT[2005/36]
English:DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE NATURE OF A BLOW AND MEASURING ITS FORCE, METHOD FOR USING SAME AND USE THEREOF FOR REFEREEING A SPORT[2005/36]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE LA NATURE D UN COUP ET DE MESURE DE SA FORCE, PROCEDE POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE ET SAN APPLICATION A L'ARBITRAGE D'UNE SPORT[2005/36]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2005National basic fee paid 
17.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/36]
03.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/31]
10.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.06.2005AT   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005BE   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005BG   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005CH   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005CY   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005CZ   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005DK   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005EE   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005ES   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005FI   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005FR   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005GR   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005HU   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005IE   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005IT   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005LU   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005MC   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005NL   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005PT   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005RO   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005SE   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005SI   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005SK   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
17.06.2005TR   M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.06.2005M01   Fee paid on   17.06.2005
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200503   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2006
31.07.200604   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2007
31.07.200705   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2008
31.07.200806   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US4527153  (SUZUKI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, lines 39-67; figure 4 *;
 [A]US4975833  (JINZAKI AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,6,7* figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5334831  (MAURICE LISA B [US]) [A] 1-5 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US6232879  (TYREN CARL [SE]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - KUCHLING H, Taschenbuch der Physik, THUN & FRANKFURT/MAIN, VERLAG HARRI DEUTSCH, XP002240314 [A] 1-3 * page 628 - page 629; table 48 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.