Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1571988

EP1571988 - ACTIVITY MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 08.12.2010  [2010/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BREMER, Joannes, G.
c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / DUNIAS, Paraskevas
c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / MIMNAGH-KELLEHER, Gillian, A.
c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / ROMMERS, Adrianus, P., J., M.
c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
05 / VERHOEVEN, Wilhelmus, L., M., C.
c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Bekkers, Joost J.J. , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/25]Bekkers, Joost J.J , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2005/37]Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date03772500.921.11.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003IB05323
Priority number, dateEP2002008021610.12.2002         Original published format: EP 02080216
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004052200
Date:24.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1571988
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1571988
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/11
[2005/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AKTIVITÄTSÜBERWACHUNG[2005/37]
English:ACTIVITY MONITORING[2005/37]
French:SURVEILLANCE D'ACTIVITES[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2005National basic fee paid 
11.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
02.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2008Fee for grant paid
14.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CY28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
TR28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
GR29.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
IE21.11.2008
LU21.11.2008
HU29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
[2010/49]
Former [2010/37]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CY28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
TR28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
IE21.11.2008
LU21.11.2008
HU29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/34]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CY28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
IE21.11.2008
LU21.11.2008
HU29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/32]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
IE21.11.2008
LU21.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/50]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
IE21.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/47]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
IE21.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/39]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
IT28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/29]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/23]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
BG28.08.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
Former [2009/22]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
EE28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
Former [2009/14]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
RO28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SK28.05.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
Former [2009/12]AT28.05.2008
BE28.05.2008
CZ28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
Former [2009/09]AT28.05.2008
DK28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
PT28.10.2008
Former [2009/07]AT28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
SE28.08.2008
ES08.09.2008
Former [2008/50]AT28.05.2008
FI28.05.2008
NL28.05.2008
SI28.05.2008
ES08.09.2008
Former [2008/47]SI28.05.2008
ES08.09.2008
Former [2008/44]SI28.05.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]US6077236  (CUNNINGHAM) [X] 1-8 * column 6, line 29 - line 67 * * column 9, line 47 - column 11, line 11 * * figures 2,8 *;
 [X]EP0727242  (PACESETTER, INC.) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 16 - line 51 * * page 6, line 42 - page 8, line 53; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US5318596  (BARRERAS ET AL.) [A] 1-8 * column 6, line 52 - column 8, line 8 * * figures 2,3,7 *