blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1572205

EP1572205 - TREATMENT OF DISEASES WITH COMBINATIONS OF ALPHA 7 NICOTINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND OTHER COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.10.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.11.2007  [2007/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC
7000 Portage Road
Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US
[2007/04]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC
301 Henrietta Street
Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CORBETT, Jeffrey, Wayne, Pfizer Global R & D
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
02 / GROPPI, Vincent Edward, Jr., Pfizer Global R & D
2800 Plymouth Road
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Laurent, Claire
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/37]Laurent, Claire
Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Application number, filing date03772599.128.11.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003IB05525
Priority number, dateUS20020432527P11.12.2002         Original published format: US 432527 P
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2004052348
Date:24.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1572205
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.2004
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/439, A61K31/46, A61P25/28, A61P25/16
[2005/37]
CPC:
A61K31/439 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/46 (EP,KR,US); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP); A61P25/16 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/46, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONSPRÄPARATE VON NICOTINSÄUREACETYLCHOLIN-REZEPTOR-AGONISTEN UND ANDEREN WIRKSTOFFEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN[2005/37]
English:TREATMENT OF DISEASES WITH COMBINATIONS OF ALPHA 7 NICOTINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTOR AGONISTS AND OTHER COMPOUNDS[2005/37]
French:TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES A L'AIDE DE COMBINAISONS D'AGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR NICOTINIQUE DE L'ACETYLCHOLINE ALPHA 7 ET D'AUTRES COMPOSES[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2005National basic fee paid 
11.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
01.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/48]
09.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200604   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO0136417  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO0160821  (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0217358  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1-97 *;
 [A]WO0215662  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *;
 [YD]WO02094768  (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO03093250  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [XP] 1,4-7,10 * claims 1-13,20,23,24,27-29,32,35,36 *;
 [Y]  - TAYLOR P, "DEVELOPMENT OF ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE INHIBITORS IN THE THERAPY OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (1998), vol. 51, no. 1 SUPPL, ISSN 0028-3878, pages S30 - S35, XP000893078 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.