blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1579226

EP1579226 - SYSTEM WITH MULTIPLE PATH FAIL OVER, FAIL BACK AND LOAD BALANCING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.09.2006  [2006/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emulex Design & Manufacturing Corporation
3333 Susan Street
Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
Emulex Design & Manufacturing Corporation
3333 Susan Street Costa Mesa
California 92626 / US
Inventor(s)01 / INFANTE, Jon, L.
3535 Harbor Boulevard
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US
02 / KARNOWSKI, Mark, J.
3535 Harbor Boulevard
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US
03 / CARLIN, Christopher
3535 Harbor Boulevard
Costa Messa, CA 92626 / US
04 / LAWSON, David, C.
3535 Harbor Boulevard
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03774921.521.10.2003
[2005/39]
WO2003US33481
Priority number, dateUS2002027818921.10.2002         Original published format: US 278189
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2004038554
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1579226
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.06.2004
ClassificationIPC:G01R31/08, G06F11/00, G06F15/173, G08C15/00, H04J1/16, H04J3/14, H04L12/26, H02H3/05, H03K19/003
[2005/39]
CPC:
G06F11/2005 (EP,US); G06F11/2007 (EP,US); G06F3/0613 (EP,US);
G06F3/0617 (EP,US); G06F3/0635 (EP,US); G06F3/067 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM MIT MEHRWEGE- FAIL OVER, FAIL BACK UND LASTAUSGLEICH[2005/39]
English:SYSTEM WITH MULTIPLE PATH FAIL OVER, FAIL BACK AND LOAD BALANCING[2005/39]
French:SYSTEME A BASCULEMENT AUTOMATIQUE, REPRISE DE FONCTIONNEMENT NORMAL ET REPARTITION DE CHARGE SUR PLUSIEURS TRAJETS[2005/39]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2005National basic fee paid 
13.05.2005Search fee paid 
13.05.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
08.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
03.08.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2002040411  (IWATANI SAWAO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US6314525  (MAHALINGHAM MALLIKARJUNAN [US], et al);
 [YP]US2002169842  (CHRISTENSEN MITCHELL T [US], et al);
 [XP]US2003126315  (TAN CHOON-SENG [US], et al);
 [XE]US2003200477  (AYRES JAMES FRANCIS [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.