Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1556870 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1556870



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 792
04.10.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
10.01.2018 Rectification of designation of inventor (Legal Division) Search / examination 1
02.01.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.12.2017 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
06.11.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.11.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 2
27.10.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
27.10.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
23.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.10.2017 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
17.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.10.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.10.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
17.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.07.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 4
03.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
17.05.2017 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
12.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents Search / examination 5
10.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
10.03.2017 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
03.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.02.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 38
24.02.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 38
24.02.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.02.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
23.01.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
20.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.10.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
19.07.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
15.07.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
13.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
17.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
17.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
17.02.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
17.02.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.02.2016 Claims Appeal 4
17.02.2016 Claims Appeal 4
17.02.2016 Description Appeal 2
17.02.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.02.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 5
25.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 20
25.01.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
25.01.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
25.01.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 20
25.01.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 10
25.01.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 10
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
25.01.2016 Description Appeal 2
25.01.2016 Description Appeal 20
25.01.2016 Description Appeal 2
25.01.2016 Description Appeal 20
25.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.01.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.12.2015 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
17.12.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
15.12.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.10.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
05.10.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
28.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.09.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.09.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
24.09.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.09.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.02.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.02.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.07.2011 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
23.03.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.03.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.03.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
28.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
28.02.2011 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 1
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 4
28.02.2011 Claims Appeal 4
28.02.2011 Description Appeal 2
28.02.2011 Description Appeal 20
28.02.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
09.11.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
09.11.2010 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.11.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
25.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.10.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
21.10.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.10.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
21.10.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
21.10.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
21.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.10.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.10.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.09.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.09.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.09.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.08.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
24.08.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
24.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 36
24.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
11.05.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.05.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
27.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.04.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.04.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
18.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
18.11.2009 Description Search / examination 2
18.11.2009 Description Search / examination 2
18.11.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 35
18.11.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.03.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 Request for change of name Search / examination 5
27.10.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
15.06.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.06.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.04.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
11.03.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
06.05.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
06.05.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 36
18.12.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.12.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 4
18.12.2003 Description International Searching Authority 19
18.12.2003 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
18.12.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 11