blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1576214

EP1576214 - APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A YARN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2012
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2024Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Summit Wool Spinners Limited
Corner Weaver and Spey Streets
Oamaru / NZ
[2008/07]
Former [2008/06]For all designated states
Nuyarn Corporation Limited
177 Maces Road
Christchurch / NZ
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
Lee, David Arthur
177 Maces Road
Christchurch / NZ
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, David Arthur
177 Maces Road
Christchurch / NZ
 [2008/44]
Former [2005/38]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/38]Brown, David Leslie
HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date03776091.514.11.2003
[2005/38]
WO2003NZ00253
Priority number, dateNZ2002052259614.11.2002         Original published format: NZ 52259602
NZ2003052501928.03.2003         Original published format: NZ 52501903
NZ2003052530814.04.2003         Original published format: NZ 52530803
[2005/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004044290
Date:27.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1576214
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1576214
Date:27.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU27.05.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2006
ClassificationIPC:D01G1/08, D01H1/11
[2005/38]
CPC:
D02G3/286 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GARN[2005/38]
English:APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A YARN[2005/38]
French:APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE FIL[2005/38]
Entry into regional phase14.06.2005National basic fee paid 
14.06.2005Search fee paid 
14.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
14.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/38]
26.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2010Fee for grant paid
13.12.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08016214.2  / EP2006428
Opposition(s)30.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200503   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2006
30.11.200604   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2007
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
HU27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
BG27.07.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
LU14.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2024/08]
Former [2013/45]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
HU27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
BG27.07.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
LU14.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/29]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
BG27.07.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
LU14.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/25]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
LU14.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/08]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/47]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
IE14.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/33]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/29]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/10]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
DK27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
SK27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
Former [2012/09]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
CZ27.04.2011
EE27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
Former [2012/01]BE27.04.2011
CY27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
SI27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
Former [2011/49]CY27.04.2011
FI27.04.2011
SE27.04.2011
GR28.07.2011
PT29.08.2011
Former [2011/47]PT29.08.2011
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1685645  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG) [Y] 11-14 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9730945  (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8* page 9, line 9 - line 32; claim - *;
 [A]US6324872  (BLASZYK PAUL E [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 10, line 13 - column 11, line 62 * * column 14, line 53 - line 67; figure 4 *;
 [Y]DE10032708  (HAMEL AG ARBON [CH]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0027]; figure - *;
 [XY]DE10025858  (HAMEL AG ARBON [CH]) [X] 1-6 [Y] 9,11-14
International search[Y]AU405827B  ;
 [X]AU2609967  ;
 [Y]AU288664B  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG);
 [A]AU455170B  ;
 [A]AU488616B  ;
 [Y]NZ336048  (DAVID ARTHUR LEE)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.