blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1576271

EP1576271 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SUPPLY OF FUEL TO A COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scania CV AB (publ)
151 87 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
Scania CV AB (publ)
151 87 Södertälje / SE
Inventor(s)01 / PETTERSSON, Magnus
Elin Wägners stig 22
S-151 55 Södertälje / SE
 [2005/38]
Application number, filing date03776114.524.11.2003
[2005/38]
WO2003SE01810
Priority number, dateSE2002000347626.11.2002         Original published format: SE 0203476
[2005/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004048764
Date:10.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1576271
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1576271
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE10.06.2004
ClassificationIPC:F02D41/26
[2005/38]
CPC:
F02D41/0087 (EP,US); F02D41/3827 (EP,US); F02D2041/2048 (EP,US);
F02D2250/26 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER BRENNSTOFFZUFUHR FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR[2005/38]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SUPPLY OF FUEL TO A COMBUSTION ENGINE[2005/38]
French:PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT DE MOTEUR A COMBUSTION[2005/38]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2005National basic fee paid 
27.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/38]
18.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2009Fee for grant paid
18.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
DK30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
IT30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
TR30.09.2009
IE24.11.2009
LU24.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB30.12.2009
GR31.12.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
HU01.04.2010
[2011/44]
Former [2011/31]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
DK30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
IT30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
IE24.11.2009
LU24.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB30.12.2009
GR31.12.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
HU01.04.2010
Former [2011/21]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
DK30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
IT30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
IE24.11.2009
LU24.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB30.12.2009
GR31.12.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2011/14]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
DK30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
IT30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
IE24.11.2009
BG30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB30.12.2009
GR31.12.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2011/05]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
DK30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
IE24.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GB30.12.2009
GR31.12.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/49]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
DK30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
IE24.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
FR30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GR31.12.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/46]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
DK30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
IE24.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
GR31.12.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/35]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
DK30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
MC30.11.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/32]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
NL30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
MC30.11.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/30]AT30.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
MC30.11.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/28]BE30.09.2009
CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/25]CY30.09.2009
CZ30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/23]CZ30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
SK30.09.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/22]CZ30.09.2009
EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
RO30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
ES10.01.2010
PT01.02.2010
Former [2010/20]EE30.09.2009
FI30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
ES10.01.2010
Former [2010/19]FI30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
ES10.01.2010
Former [2010/11]FI30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
SI30.09.2009
Former [2010/09]FI30.09.2009
SE30.09.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH08291728  ;
 [A]US4941442  (NANYOSHI YASUTOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5775296  (GOERAS ANDERS J [SE], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 199, no. 703, & JP08291728 A 19961105 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP)
ExaminationEP0170891
by applicantEP0170891
 US5131371
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.