Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1685134

EP1685134 - NOVEL CHELIDONINE DERIVATIVES, METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCING PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2012Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Salama, Zoser B. nat.rer.Dr.
Ansgarstrasse 13
13465 Berlin / DE
[2006/31]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2006/31]
Representative(s)Boeckh, Tobias , et al
Hertin und Partner
Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Kurfürstendamm 54/55
10707 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/31]Boeckh, Tobias , et al
HERTIN Anwaltssozietät Kurfürstendamm 54/55
10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date03776835.505.11.2003
[2006/31]
WO2003DE03702
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005044820
Date:19.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1685134
Date:02.08.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005
[2006/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1685134
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07D491/14, A61P35/00
[2006/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/31]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUE CHELIDONIN-DERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN WIRKSTOFFEN[2006/31]
English:NOVEL CHELIDONINE DERIVATIVES, METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCING PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS[2006/31]
French:NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE CHELIDONINE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR PRODUIRE DES PRINCIPES ACTIFS PHARMACEUTIQUES[2006/31]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2006National basic fee paid 
02.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/31]
06.07.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2008Fee for grant paid
01.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination13.01.2012Appeal received No.  J0006/12
13.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
AT05.11.2009
GB05.11.2009
LU05.11.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/31]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
AT05.11.2009
GB05.11.2009
LU05.11.2009
Former [2011/21]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
AT05.11.2009
GB05.11.2009
LU05.11.2009
Former [2011/14]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
AT05.11.2009
GB05.11.2009
Former [2011/08]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
AT05.11.2009
GB05.11.2009
Former [2011/05]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
GB05.11.2009
Former [2010/49]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/08]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2009/50]CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2009/47]DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IE11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/46]DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/40]FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/34]NL11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]WO02092085  (CHAE SOO-WAN ; EUN JAE-SOON (KR); JUNG YOUNG HOON (KR); KIM DAE-KEUN () [X] 1-5,27-38 * scheme 1-5; page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 6; claim -; compound 4 *;
 [X]  - GRYNKIEWICZ G ET AL, "Synthesis and biological activity of O-acyl and O-alkyl chelidonine derivatives", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, (200111), vol. 36, no. 11-12, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 951 - 960, XP004400915 [X] 1-5,27-38 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(01)80010-6