Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1554773 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1554773



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 516
05.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.06.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.06.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.06.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.06.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 19
16.05.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.05.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.05.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
23.04.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.04.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Appeal 2
19.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.03.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.02.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
20.02.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
01.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.01.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
24.01.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
19.01.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.01.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
19.10.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
10.10.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 3
17.02.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
16.11.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
07.11.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
30.10.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
01.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
03.09.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
30.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
27.08.2012 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
27.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.08.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.08.2012 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
24.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 3
24.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.08.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
12.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.06.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
29.06.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.06.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.06.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
29.06.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.06.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.06.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
29.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
29.06.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.04.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.03.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2012 Claims Opposition 3
30.01.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.12.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
13.12.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.12.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.11.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
28.10.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
26.10.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
28.06.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.06.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.06.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.05.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.05.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.05.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
22.05.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 30
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 3
19.05.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 30
19.05.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.05.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.05.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
23.07.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.07.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
07.07.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
03.04.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.04.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.04.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.04.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
02.11.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.10.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
08.06.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
14.03.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.03.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
25.02.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.07.2004 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
17.06.2004 Refund of fees (PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.05.2004 International preliminary examination report - Automated PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.05.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.05.2004 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
27.04.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.04.2004 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.04.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.04.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
16.04.2004 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.04.2004 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
03.11.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
03.11.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 3
03.11.2003 Description International Searching Authority 9
03.11.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 5