EP1577358 - Method for production of pressure-sensitive adhesive sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/38] | ADHESIVE SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
[2009/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lintec Corporation Honcho 23-23, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2009/28] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Lintec Corporation Honcho 23-23, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Kiichiro LINTEC CORPORATION 5-14-42, Nishiki-cho Warabi-shi, Saitama 335-0005 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Kazuya LINTEC CORPORATION 5-14-42, Nishiki-cho Warabi-shi, Saitama 335-0005 / JP | 03 /
TAKEMOTO, Takashi LINTEC CORPORATION 5-14-42, Nishiki-cho Warabi-shi, Saitama 335-0005 / JP | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO., 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03777190.4 | 03.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003JP15458 | Priority number, date | JP20020379279 | 27.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002379279 | JP20030304028 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003304028 | WO2003JP13866 | 29.10.2003 Original published format: PCT/JP0313/866 | [2005/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061032 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1577358 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1577358 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
C09J7/20 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/384 (KR);
C09J2301/18 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T156/1056 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines druckempfindlichen Klebeblatts | [2009/07] | English: | Method for production of pressure-sensitive adhesive sheet | [2009/07] | French: | PROCéDé DE FABRICATION d'une feuille adhésive sensible à la pression | [2009/07] |
Former [2005/38] | KLEBESCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | ||
Former [2005/38] | ADHESIVE SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | ||
Former [2005/38] | FEUILLE ADH SIVE ET PROC D DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2005 | Translation filed | 22.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.01.2009 | 07.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08006171.6 / EP1964901 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Request for further processing for: | 08.01.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2009 | CY | 08.07.2009 | CZ | 08.07.2009 | DK | 08.07.2009 | EE | 08.07.2009 | FI | 08.07.2009 | IT | 08.07.2009 | RO | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | SI | 08.07.2009 | SK | 08.07.2009 | TR | 08.07.2009 | BG | 08.10.2009 | GR | 09.10.2009 | ES | 19.10.2009 | PT | 09.11.2009 | IE | 03.12.2009 | LU | 03.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | HU | 09.01.2010 | [2012/41] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
TR | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.12.2009 | ||
LU | 03.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
HU | 09.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.12.2009 | ||
LU | 03.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
HU | 09.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.12.2009 | ||
LU | 03.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
IE | 03.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 08.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3085024 (BLACKFORD BENJAMIN B) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 44-58 * * column 3, lines 46-60; figure -; example 1 *; | [X]US5275856 (CALHOUN CLYDE D [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 37 ** column 6, lines 13-19; figure 1; examples 4,4c *; | [X]US5810756 (MONTECALVO DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, lines 18-62 * * column 5, lines 10-23 * * column 7, lines 12-28; figures 1-5 * | International search | [Y]JPS6281473 (SANOYAS CORP); | [X]JPH02107628 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER); | [X]JPH04100235U ; | [Y]JPH07164873 (CHUO YOHIN KK); | [Y]JPH10195395 (SLIONTEC KK); | [Y]JP2002002777 (ASAHI KASEI CORP); | [Y]JP2002294044 (UNITIKA LTD) |