blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1576123

EP1576123 - PROCESS FOR THE BIOLOGICAL PRODUCTION OF 1,3-PROPANEDIOL WITH HIGH YIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
General Counsel, 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto
California 94304-1013 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/52]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
General Counsel, 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto
California 94304-1013 / US
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington DE 19898 / US
For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
General Counsel, 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto
California 94304-1013 / US
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
General Counsel, 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto
California 94304-1013 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CERVIN, Marguerite, A.
404 Palomar Drive
94062 Redwood city, California / US
02 / SOUCAILLE, Phillipe
56 Edinburgh Street
San Francisco, CA 94010 / US
03 / VALLE, Fernando
1015 Cadillac Way, Apartment 212
Burlingame, CA 94112 / US
 [2007/09]
Former [2005/38]01 / CERVIN, Marguerite, A.
300-137 East First Street
N. Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 1B2 / CA
02 / SOUCAILLE, Phillipe
56 Edinburgh Street
San Francisco, CA 94010 / US
03 / VALLE, Fernando
1015 Cadillac Way, Apartment 212
Burlingame, CA 94112 / US
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
154 Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/38]Hirsch & Associés
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date03777548.306.10.2003
[2005/38]
WO2003US31805
Priority number, dateUS20020416192P04.10.2002         Original published format: US 416192 P
[2005/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2004033646
Date:22.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1576123
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1576123
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.05.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2007
ClassificationIPC:C12N1/20, C12P7/00, C12P7/18
[2007/37]
CPC:
C12P7/18 (EP,US); C12N1/20 (KR); C12N15/70 (KR);
C12P7/20 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2006/26]C12N1/20, C12P7/00, C12N1/21, C12P7/18
Former IPC [2005/38]C12N1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BIOLOGISCHEN HERSTELLUNG VON 1,3-PROPANDIOL MIT HOHER AUSBEUTE[2005/38]
English:PROCESS FOR THE BIOLOGICAL PRODUCTION OF 1,3-PROPANEDIOL WITH HIGH YIELD[2005/38]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION BIOLOGIQUE A HAUT RENDEMENT DE 1,3-PROPANEDIOL[2005/38]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase04.05.2005National basic fee paid 
04.05.2005Search fee paid 
13.11.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.11.2006Examination requested  [2006/52]
04.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2010Fee for grant paid
12.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HU29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
PT29.04.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/47]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/38]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/37]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/36]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/35]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/31]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
Former [2011/24]CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0112833  (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - DE REUSE H ET AL, "THE PTS-H PTS-I AND CRR GENES OF THE ESCHERICHIA-COLI PHOSPHOENOLPYRUVATE-DEPENDENT PHOSPHOTRANSFERASE SYSTEM A COMPLEX OPERON WITH SEVERAL MODES OF TRANSCRIPTION", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1988), vol. 170, no. 9, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 3827 - 3837, XP002445495
 [A]  - POSTMA P W ET AL, "PHOSPHOENOLPYRUVATE: CARBOHYDRATE PHOSPHOTRANSFERASE SYSTEMS OF BACTERIA", MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199309), vol. 57, no. 3, ISSN 0146-0749, pages 543 - 594, XP001051826
International search[A]US6432686  (BULTHUIS BEN A [NL], et al);
 [A]US6472169  (FROST JOHN W [US], et al);
 [A]US2002168654  (MARANAS COSTAS D [US], et al);
 [A]US2005208615  (WILKINS ANTOINETTE E [US], et al);
 [A]US6962794  (VALLE FERNANDO [MX], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.