Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1558271

EP1558271 - COMPOSITIONS THAT TREAT OR INHIBIT PATHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH INFLAMMATORY RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.01.2015
Database last updated on 21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.02.2015  [2015/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metaproteomics, LLC
100 Avenida La Pata
San Clemente, CA 92673 / US
[2005/31]
Inventor(s)01 / TRIPP, Matthew, L.
4202 71st Avenue Court NW
Gig Harbor, WA 98335 / US
02 / BABISH, John, G.
508 White Church Road
Brooktondale, NY 14817 / US
03 / BLAND, Jeffrey, S.
957 11th Lane
Fox Island, WA 98333 / US
04 / DARLAND, Gary
1718 Clorindi Circle NW
Gig Harbor, WA 98335 / US
05 / LERMAN, Robert
6918 Cascade Avenue
Gig Harbor, WA 98335 / US
06 / LUKACZER, Daniel, O.
5820 98th Avenue NW
Gig Harbor, WA 98335 / US
07 / LISKA, DeAnn, J.
6210 North Parkway
Tacoma, WA 98407 / US
08 / HOWELL, Terrence
36 Lake Store Road
Lansing, NY 14882 / US
 [2005/31]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/26]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2005/31]Hill, Justin John , et al
McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate
London EC2N 3AR / GB
Application number, filing date03777751.320.10.2003
[2005/31]
WO2003US33362
Priority number, dateUS20020420383P21.10.2002         Original published format: US 420383 P
US20030450237P25.02.2003         Original published format: US 450237 P
US2003040029326.03.2003         Original published format: US 400293
US2003040128326.03.2003         Original published format: US 401283
US2003046483418.06.2003         Original published format: US 464834
US2003046441018.06.2003         Original published format: US 464410
[2005/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004037180
Date:06.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1558271
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004
[2005/31]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US30.09.2004
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/78
[2005/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/31]
Extension statesAL05.05.2005
LT05.05.2005
LV05.05.2005
MK05.05.2005
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODERHEMMUNG PATHOLOGISCHER ZUSTÄNDE IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINER ENTZÜNDLICHEN ANTWORT[2005/31]
English:COMPOSITIONS THAT TREAT OR INHIBIT PATHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH INFLAMMATORY RESPONSE[2005/31]
French:COMPOSITIONS TRAITANT OU INHIBANT DES ETATS PATHOLOGIQUES ASSOCIES A LA REACTION INFLAMMATOIRE[2005/31]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2005National basic fee paid 
05.05.2005Search fee paid 
05.05.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/31]
11.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2010Observations by third parties
03.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/08]
10.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/08]
Divisional application(s)EP10162891.5  / EP2221052
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201412   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[Y]US2002086070  (KUHRTS ERIC HAUSER [US]);
 [A]US5523489  (TING PATRICK L [US], et al);
 [Y]US6129907  (SREENIVASAN PREM K [US], et al);
 [Y]US5370863  (BARNEY MICHAEL C [US], et al)
other   - "Iklil-ul-Jabal", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/166, XP003027461
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, vol. I, page 188,
    - "Zimaad-e-Iklil-ul-Jabal", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/166B, XP003029568
    - "Ksara Gutika", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS23/947, XP003029569
    - VAGABHATA, Astanga Hrdaya, vol. 8, page 698,