blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1578794

EP1578794 - A NOVEL PHOSPHOPROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.01.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.02.2011  [2011/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WALTER AND ELIZA HALL INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH
1G Royal Parade
Parkville, VIC 3052 / AU
[2005/39]
Inventor(s)01 / OLAYIOYE, Monilola
21/16 Courtney Street
North Melbourne, Victoria 3051 / AU
02 / VISVADER, Jane
12 Holroyd Street
Kew, Victoria 3101 / AU
03 / LINDEMAN, Geoffrey
12 Holroyd Street
Kew, Victoria 3101 / AU
04 / HOFFMANN, Peter
Kochstrasse 35
04275 Leipzig / DE
05 / POMORSKI, Thomas
Invalidenstrasse 42
10115 Berlin / DE
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Jones, Elizabeth Louise
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]Jones, Elizabeth Louise
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date03779560.612.12.2003
[2005/39]
WO2003AU01664
Priority number, dateAU2002095334113.12.2002         Original published format: AU 2002953341
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004055047
Date:01.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1578794
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU01.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2006
ClassificationIPC:C07K14/47, A61K38/17, G01N33/574
[2006/35]
CPC:
C07K14/47 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/57484 (EP,US); A61K38/00 (EP,US); C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2005/39]C07K14/47, A61K38/17, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUES PHOSPHOPROTEIN[2005/39]
English:A NOVEL PHOSPHOPROTEIN[2005/39]
French:NOUVELLE PHOSPHOPROTEINE[2005/39]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2005National basic fee paid 
12.07.2005Search fee paid 
12.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
12.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
26.08.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/07]
07.09.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/07]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.04.2008Request for further processing filed
25.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - "Human colon cancer antigen encoding cDNA SEQ ID NO:410", EMBL, (20010903), Database accession no. AAH33354, URL: EBI, XP002390765 [X] 1-6 * column A *
 [X]  - "Seq:2 from patent US6287786", EMBL, (20011217), Database accession no. AAE80966, URL: EBI, XP002390766 [X] 12-16 * column A *
 [X]  - "Protein expressed by a human renal compensatiory hypertrophy gene.", EMBL, (20010202), Database accession no. AAB28178, URL: EBI, XP002390767 [X] 12-16 * column A *
 [A]  - ZHANG SHI YU ET AL, "E2F-1: A proliferative marker of breast neoplasia", CANCER EPIDEMIOLOGY BIOMARKERS AND PREVENTION, (200004), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1055-9965, pages 395 - 401, XP002391288 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TSONGALIS GREGORY J ET AL, "HER2: The Neu prognostic marker for breast cancer", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN CLINICAL LABORATORY SCIENCES, (200104), vol. 38, no. 2, ISSN 1040-8363, pages 167 - 182, XP009069652 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/20014091084191
 [A]  - VISVADER J E ET AL, "THE LIM DOMAIN GENE LMO4 INHIBITS DIFFERENTIATION OF MAMMARY EPITHELIAL CELLS IN VITRO AND IS OVEREXPRESSED IN BREAST CANCER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20011204), vol. 98, no. 25, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14452 - 14457, XP001199416 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.251547698
International search[X]WO0155364  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al);
 [XP]WO03004989  (MILLENIUM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al);
 [X]  - LAI C.H. ET AL., "Identification of novel human genes evolutionarily conserved in Caenorhabditis elegans by comparative proteomics", Database accession no. (AAD34047), XP003001494
    [ ] - GENOME RES., (2000), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 703 - 713
 [X]  - COLLINS F.S., "Generation and initial analysis of more that 15,000 full-length human and mouse cDNA sequences", PROCEDURE OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20021224), vol. 99, no. 26, pages 16899 - 16903, XP002298284

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.242603899
 [X]  - YAMANAKA M. ET AL., "Molecular cloning and characterization of phosphatidylcholine transfer protein-like protein gene expressed in murine haploid germ cells", BIOL. REPROD., (2000), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 1694 - 1701, XP008071712

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod62.6.1694
    [ ] - Database accession no. (PCTL_MOUSE)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.