Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1561116

EP1561116 - SCD40L AND PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR (PlGF) USED AS A BIOCHEMICAL MARKER COMBINATION IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/32]SCD40L AND PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR (PLGF) USED AS A BIOCHEMICAL MARKER COMBINATION IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES
[2009/13]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.04.2008
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, GB
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Products GmbH
Görzhäuser Hof Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
[2008/42]
Former [2008/19]For all designated states
Dade Behring Marburg GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Former [2005/32]For all designated states
Dade Behring Marburg GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ZEIHER, Andreas, M.
Deutschherrnufer 47
60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE
02 / HEESCHEN, Christopher
Woogstrasse 5
60431 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / DIMMELER, Stefanie
Deutschherrnufer 47
60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE
04 / HAMM, Christian
Philosophenweg 16
61350 Bad Homburg / DE
 [2005/32]
Representative(s)Krauss, Jan , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Krauss, Jan , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2009/41]Huhn, Michael , et al
Neustadter Strasse 71-75
68309 Mannheim / DE
Former [2005/32]Krauss, Jan
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date03779880.810.11.2003
[2005/32]
WO2003EP12531
Priority number, dateDE2002105352516.11.2002         Original published format: DE 10253525
DE2003101605908.04.2003         Original published format: DE 10316059
[2005/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004046722
Date:03.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1561116
Date:10.08.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004
[2005/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1561116
Date:07.05.2008
Language:DE
[2008/19]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1561116
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1561116
Date:01.04.2009
[2009/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68, C07K14/705
[2005/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/19]
Former [2005/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCD40L, PAPP-A UND PLAZENTALER-WACHSTUMSFAKTOR (PIGF) ALS BIOCHEMISCHE MARKERKOMBINATIONEN BEI KARDIOVASKULÄREN ERKRANKUNGEN[2005/32]
English:SCD40L AND PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR (PlGF) USED AS A BIOCHEMICAL MARKER COMBINATION IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES[2009/13]
French:SCD40L ET FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE PLACENTAIRE (PIGF) SERVANT DE COMBINAISONS DE MARQUEURS BIOCHIMIQUES POUR DES MALADIES CARDIOVASCULAIRES[2005/32]
Former [2005/32]SCD40L AND PLACENTAL GROWTH FACTOR (PLGF) USED AS A BIOCHEMICAL MARKER COMBINATION IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES
Entry into regional phase12.05.2005National basic fee paid 
12.05.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/32]
25.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2008Fee for grant paid
28.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08008523.6  / EP1962096
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  07.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/18]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  07.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
Former [2015/16]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  07.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Stolmár & Partner
Patentanwälte
PartG mbB
Blumenstr. 17
80331 München / DE
Former [2014/43]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  07.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Stolmár & Partner
Blumenstr. 17
80331 München / DE
Former [2014/31]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  07.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Stolmár & Partner
Hüttenstraße 3
40215 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2013/16]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  07.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Patentanwalt
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
Former [2011/44]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  07.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
N4, 1
68161 Mannheim / DE
Former [2009/49]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009  07.04.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Neustadter Strasse 71-75
68309 Mannheim / DE
Former [2009/12]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.2009   
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Huhn, Michael
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
17.04.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.11.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.09.2010Date of oral proceedings
22.11.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.11.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
26.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition12.01.2017Appeal received No.  T2717/16
10.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2717/16
10.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
22.12.2010Appeal received No.  T0019/11
29.03.2011Statement of grounds filed
25.02.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
25.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
IE10.11.2013
LU10.11.2013
AT10.11.2017
GB10.11.2017
SE11.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NL01.12.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/45]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
IE10.11.2013
LU10.11.2013
AT10.11.2017
SE11.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NL01.12.2017
Former [2018/40]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
IE10.11.2013
LU10.11.2013
AT10.11.2017
SE11.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/35]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
IE10.11.2013
LU10.11.2013
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2015/34]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
IE10.11.2013
LU10.11.2013
Former [2014/48]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
IE10.11.2013
Former [2010/49]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
GR08.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/37]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
TR07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/34]CY07.05.2008
CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
HU08.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/29]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/23]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
BG07.08.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
EE07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/14]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
RO07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
SK07.05.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/12]CZ07.05.2008
DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2009/09]DK07.05.2008
FI07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
PT07.10.2008
Former [2008/50]FI07.05.2008
SI07.05.2008
Former [2008/44]SI07.05.2008
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO03040691  (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL) [PX] 1-21 * claims 1-29 *;
 [A]WO9820155  (NEW YORK SOCIETY FOR THE RUPTU) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO02056015  (BAYES-GENIS ANTONIO ; SCHWARTZ ROBERT S (US); HOLMES DAVID R (US); MAY) [X] 1-21 * page 2, line 4 - line 10 * * page 5, line 7 - line 12 * * page 6, line 5 - line 9 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 14 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 19 * * claims 1-4,7-16 *;
 [A]WO0156593  (FLANDERS INTERUNIVERSITY INST ; CARMELIET PETER (BE); LEUVEN RES AND D) [A] 1-21 * claims 1,4,5 *;
 [XD]  - SCHONBECK UWE ET AL, "Soluble CD40L and cardiovascular risk in women", CIRCULATION, (20011106), vol. 104, no. 19, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 2266 - 2268, XP002273044 [XD] 1-21 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/hc4401.099447
 [DX]  - PENG DAO-QUAN ET AL, "Elevated soluble CD40 ligand is related to the endothelial adhesion molecules in patients with acute coronary syndrome", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, (20020507), vol. 319, no. 1, ISSN 0009-8981, pages 19 - 26, XP002273045 [DX] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-8981(02)00014-1
 [X]  - YAN JINCHUAN ET AL, "Clinical implications of increased expression of CD40L in patients with acute coronary syndromes", CHINESE MEDICAL JOURNAL (ENGLISH EDITION), (200204), vol. 115, no. 4, ISSN 0366-6999, pages 491 - 493, XP008028508 [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [DX]  - AUKRUST PAL ET AL, "Enhanced levels of soluble and membrane-bound CD40 ligand in patients with unstable angina: Possible reflection of T lymphocyte and platelet involvement in the pathogenesis of acute coronary syndromes", CIRCULATION, (19990810), vol. 100, no. 6, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 614 - 620, XP002273046 [DX] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HEESCHEN CHRISTOPHER ET AL, "CD40 ligand serum levels independently predicts outcome and effect of anti-platelet therapy in patients with unstable angina.", CIRCULATION, Abstracts from Scientific Sessions;Chicago, IL, USA; November 17-20, 2002, (20021105), vol. 106, no. 19 Supplement, ISSN 0009-7322 (ISSN print), page II.402, XP008028499 [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [Y]  - GARLICHS C D ET AL, "Patients with acute coronary syndromes express enhanced CD40 ligand/CD154 on platelets", HEART (LONDON), (200112), vol. 86, no. 6, ISSN 1355-6037, pages 649 - 655, XP008028515 [Y] 1-21 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/heart.86.6.649
 [Y]  - BAYES-GENIS ANTONIO ET AL, "Identification of pregnancy-associated plasma protein A (PAPP-A) as a new marker of acute coronary syndromes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, 50th Annual Scientific Session of the American College of Cardiology;Orlando, Florida, USA; March 18-21, 2001, (200102), vol. 37, no. 2 Supplement A, ISSN 0735-1097, page 301A, XP008028486 [Y] 1-21 * abstract *
 [PX]  - VARO NEREA ET AL, "Soluble CD40L: risk prediction after acute coronary syndromes.", CIRCULATION. UNITED STATES 2 SEP 2003, (20030902), vol. 108, no. 9, ISSN 1524-4539, pages 1049 - 1052, XP002273047 [PX] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000088521.04017.13
 [X]  - BAYES-GENIS ANTONI ET AL, "Pregnancy-associated plasma protein A as a marker of acute coronary syndromes", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20011004), vol. 345, no. 14, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 1022 - 1029, XP002909589 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 1023, column 1, paragraph 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa003147
 [X]  - KHOSRAVI JAVAD ET AL, "Pregnancy associated plasma protein-A: Ultrasensitive immunoassay and determination in coronary heart disease.", CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (200210), vol. 35, no. 7, ISSN 0009-9120, pages 531 - 538, XP001188913 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 532, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 533, column 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-9120(02)00359-4
 [X]  - DENKTAS A E ET AL, "PREGNANCY ASSOCIATED PLASMA PROTEIN-A LEVELS ARE ELEVATED IN PATIENTS WITH UNSTABLE ANGINA", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF CARDIOLOGY, XX, (20020831), vol. 23, no. ABSTR SUPPL, ISSN 0195-668X, page 466, XP008028493 [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - HAJEK P ET AL, "Pregnancy-associated plasma protein a (PAPP-A) in determination of unstable coronary plaque.", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, & CONGRESS OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF CARDIOLOGY; BERLIN, GERMANY; AUGUST 31-SEPTEMBER 04, 2002, (2002), vol. 23, no. Abstract Supplement, ISSN 0195-668X, page 293, XP008028492 [X] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - FUTTERMAN LAURIE G ET AL, "Novel markers in the acute coronary syndrome: BNP, IL-6, PAPP-A.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CRITICAL CARE : AN OFFICIAL PUBLICATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CRITICAL-CARE NURSES. MAR 2002, (200203), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1062-3264, pages 168 - 172, XP008031012 [X] 1-21 * page 170, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - MAGLIONE D ET AL, "RECOMBINANT PRODUCTION OF PIGF-1 AND ITS ACTIVITY IN ANIMAL MODELS", FARMACO, SOCIETA CHIMICA ITALIANA, PAVIA, IT, (2000), vol. 55, ISSN 0014-827X, pages 165 - 167, XP001000056 [A] 1-21 * page 166, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 167, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-827X(00)00012-4
 [A]  - LUTTUN A ET AL, "Revascularization of ischemic tissues by PlGF treatment, and inhibition of tumor angiogenesis, arthritis and atherosclerosis by anti-Flt1", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, US, (200208), vol. 8, no. 8, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 831 - 840, XP002258708 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO0185796
OppositionWO0075163
    - TORRY et al., "Preeclampsia is associated with reduced serum levels of placenta growth factor", Am J Obstet Gynecol, (19981200), vol. 179, no. 6, pages 1539 - 1544, XP027442247

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9378(98)70021-3