Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1561116


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.08.2017 Change: Appeal number
11.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
13.01.2017 New entry: Appeal number
13.01.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
21.12.2016 Change: Appeal number
21.12.2016 New entry: Appeal number
21.12.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
18.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
14.12.2016 Deletion: Despatch of interlocutory decision
01.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
01.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.07.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2016 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.05.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
01.04.2016 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  04.05.2016  [2016/18]
03.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.08.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
14.08.2015 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
13.03.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
19.09.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
27.06.2014 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
15.03.2013 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
07.01.2013 Change: Appeal number
30.09.2011 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
15.04.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
05.01.2011 Change: Appeal number
28.12.2010 New entry: Appeal number
28.12.2010 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
18.11.2010 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.11.2010 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
05.11.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.12.2010  [2010/49]
13.08.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.09.2010  [2010/37]
23.07.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.08.2010  [2010/34]
09.04.2010 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
13.11.2009 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.10.2009 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  02.12.2009  [2009/49]
02.10.2009 Change - representative published on  04.11.2009  [2009/45]
04.09.2009 Change - representative published on  07.10.2009  [2009/41]
25.08.2009 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
12.06.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.07.2009  [2009/29]
01.05.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2009  [2009/23]
24.04.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2009  [2009/22]
07.04.2009 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
20.03.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.04.2009  [2009/17]
13.03.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.04.2009  [2009/16]
27.02.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.04.2009  [2009/14]
27.02.2009 Correction of patent specification published on  01.04.2009  [2009/14]
20.02.2009 Change - English title published on  25.03.2009  [2009/13]
13.02.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2009  [2009/12]
13.02.2009 Opposition filed published on  18.03.2009  [2009/12]
23.01.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
23.01.2009 Correction of patent specification published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
13.11.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2008  [2008/50]
26.09.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.10.2008  [2008/44]
12.09.2008 Change - applicant published on  15.10.2008  [2008/42]
09.05.2008 Change - divisional application(s) published on  11.06.2008  [2008/24]
04.04.2008 (Expected) grant published on  07.05.2008  [2008/19]
07.03.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.03.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.12.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.05.2007 First examination report
17.05.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.05.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.12.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.09.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.08.2006 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.03.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.01.2006 Change - extension states published on  08.03.2006  [2006/10]
09.12.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.08.2005 Amendment by applicant
24.06.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.08.2005  [2005/32]
24.06.2005 Request for examination filed published on  10.08.2005  [2005/32]
26.05.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
25.05.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
13.01.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
27.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
09.06.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
04.06.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
31.03.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
23.02.2004 PCT data prior to European publication