blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1577784

EP1577784 - COMMUNICATION METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RELAY SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION PROGRAM, PROGRAM FOR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MAIL DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM, MAIL DISTRIBUTION METHOD, AND MAIL DISTRIBUTION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  29.07.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 31.08.2016  [2016/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWASHIMA, Masahisa, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
02 / HOSHINO, Fumitaka, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
03 / FUJIMURA, Akiko, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
04 / KINOSHITA, Shingo, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
05 / NAKAO, Masayoshi, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
06 / SAITO, Noriaki, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
07 / TSURUOKA, Yukio, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
08 / TAKAHASHI, Katsumi, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
09 / ABE, Tsuyoshi, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
10 / MIYAKE, Jun, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
 [2005/40]
Former [2005/38]01 / KAWASHIMA, Masahisa, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
02 / HOSHINO, Fumitaka, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
03 / FUJIMURA, Akiko, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
04 / KINOSHITA, Shingo, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
05 / NAKAO, Masayoshi, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
06 / SAITOU, Akinori, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
07 / TSURUOKA, Yukio, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
08 / TAKAHASHI, Katsumi, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
09 / ABE, Tsuyoshi, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
10 / MIYAKE, Jun, NTT Intel. Property Cntr.
9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome
Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/38]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03780966.219.12.2003
[2005/38]
WO2003JP16396
Priority number, dateJP2002036979920.12.2002         Original published format: JP 2002369799
JP2003002597603.02.2003         Original published format: JP 2003025976
JP2003035213010.10.2003         Original published format: JP 2003352130
JP2003035213110.10.2003         Original published format: JP 2003352131
[2005/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004057480
Date:08.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1577784
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2009
ClassificationIPC:G06F13/00, H04M3/42, H04M3/50, H04L9/00
[2005/38]
CPC:
G06Q10/107 (EP,US); H04L51/48 (EP,US); H04L51/212 (EP,US);
H04L61/30 (EP,US); H04L61/301 (EP,US); H04L61/4555 (EP,US);
H04M3/00 (EP,KR,US); H04L2101/37 (EP,US); H04L63/0428 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/15]
Former [2005/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, RELAISSYSTEM,KOMMUNIKATIONSPROGRAMM, PROGRAMM FÜR EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM,POSTVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM, POSTVERTEILUNGSVERFAHREN UND POSTVERTEILUNGSPROGRAMM[2005/38]
English:COMMUNICATION METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RELAY SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION PROGRAM, PROGRAM FOR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MAIL DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM, MAIL DISTRIBUTION METHOD, AND MAIL DISTRIBUTION PROGRAM[2005/38]
French:PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTEME DE RELAIS, PROGRAMME DE COMMUNICATION, PROGRAMME DE SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION DE COURRIER, PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION DE COURRIER, ET PROGRAMME DE DISTRIBUTION DE COURRIER[2005/38]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2005Translation filed 
09.06.2005National basic fee paid 
09.06.2005Search fee paid 
09.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/38]
20.09.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
26.10.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
04.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2016
13.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/35]
23.04.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/35]
30.06.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP11164732.7  / EP2357595
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
09.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
19.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201513   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9818249  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-42 * abstract * * page 7, line 21 - page 14, line 23 * * page 18, line 13 - page 20, line 14 * * page 29, line 18 - page 30, line 28 *;
 [X]JP2000339236  (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-42 * abstract *;
 [A]US2001051990  (SHIRAKAWA TAKAHISA [JP]) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0047] *;
 [X]EP1223527  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-42 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033] *;
 US7058684  [ ] (UEDA HARUYASU [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 32 * * column 7, line 7 - column 9, line 17 ** column 15, line 26 - column 16, line 67 *;
 [A]  - GOLDBERG I ET AL, "Privacy-enhancing technologies for the Internet", COMPCON '97. PROCEEDINGS, IEEE SAN JOSE, CA, USA 23-26 FEB. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970223), ISBN 978-0-8186-7804-2, pages 103 - 109, XP010219518 [A] 1-42

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CMPCON.1997.584680
International search[A]JPH08251231  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JPH11161574  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC);
 [A]JP2000201169  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [X]JP2000339236  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [Y]JP2001268230  (EITSUU KK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.