blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1573307

EP1573307 - PIEZOELECTRIC SENSOR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, CY, HU, NL, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Attana AB
Björnnäsvägen 21
113 47 Stockholm / SE
[2005/37]
Inventor(s)01 / AASTRUP, Teodor
Danderydsvägen 20F
SE-182 66 Djursholm / SE
02 / SMITH, Jan
Motalavägen 21
SE-115 43 Stockholm / SE
03 / ANDERSON, Henrik
Fiskargränd 65
SE-175 55 Järfälla / SE
 [2006/52]
Former [2005/37]01 / AASTRUP, Teodor
Grubbensringen 33
S-112 69 Stockholm / SE
02 / SMITH, Jan
Ringvägen 88
S-118 60 Stockholm / SE
03 / ANDERSON, Henrik
Tulegatan 70
S-172 72 Sundbyberg / SE
Representative(s)Elsworth, Jon David
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2015/28]
Former [2011/16]Jones, Nicholas Andrew
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2005/37]Linde, Jörgen
Albihns Stockholm AB, P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date03781230.218.12.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003SE02001
Priority number, dateSE2002000377219.12.2002         Original published format: SE 0203772
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004057319
Date:08.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1573307
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1573307
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.07.2004
ClassificationIPC:G01N29/036
[2015/04]
CPC:
G01N29/036 (EP,US); G01N2291/0256 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2005/37]G01N27/12, C12M1/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/28]
Former [2005/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PIEZOELEKTRISCHE SENSORANORDNUNG[2005/37]
English:PIEZOELECTRIC SENSOR ARRANGEMENT[2005/37]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2005National basic fee paid 
16.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
27.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2014
04.12.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
23.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2015Fee for grant paid
29.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2011
Opposition(s)11.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.12.2003
AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
BG08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
TR08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
GB18.12.2015
IE18.12.2015
LU18.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
GB18.12.2015
IE18.12.2015
LU18.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/50]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
GB18.12.2015
IE18.12.2015
LU18.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
FR31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/47]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
GB18.12.2015
IE18.12.2015
LU18.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/46]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE18.12.2015
LU18.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
CH31.12.2015
LI31.12.2015
Former [2016/45]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE18.12.2015
LU18.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
LU18.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
LU18.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/23]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/21]AT08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
IT08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT08.07.2015
ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19734708  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE])
ExaminationJPH06221980
 JPH06308130
 JPH0875628
 US5728583
 WO0212873
    - MASSON M ET AL, "QUARTZ CRYSTAL MICROBALANCE BIOAFFINITY SENSOR FOR BIOTIN", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19950701), vol. 67, no. 13, doi:10.1021/AC00109A047, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2212 - 2215, XP000515503

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00109a047
    - MICHAEL THOMPSON ET AL, "The Potential of the Bulk Acoustic Wave Device as a Liquid-Phase Immunosensor", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS, AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, (19870101), vol. UFFC-34, no. 2, pages 127 - 135, XP055000855

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/T-UFFC.1987.26923
    - SHANA Z A ET AL, "Theory and application of a quartz resonator as a sensor for viscous liquids", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 231, doi:10.1016/S0003-2670(00)86434-X, ISSN 0003-2670, (19900101), pages 317 - 320, (19900101), XP026725107

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-2670(00)86434-X
    - ADRIAN C. STEVENSON ET AL, "Gigahertz surface acoustic wave probe for chemical analysis", THE ANALYST, (20010101), vol. 126, doi:10.1039/b107062b, pages 1619 - 1624, XP055000860

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b107062b
    - WANG A W ET AL, "AN ULTRASONIC FLEXURAL PLATE-WAVE SENSOR FOR MEASUREMENT OF DIFFUSION IN GELS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19930601), vol. 65, no. 11, doi:10.1021/AC00059A026, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1639 - 1642, XP000361719

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00059a026
    - MCDONALD J C ET AL, "Fabrication of microfluidic systems in poly(dimethylsiloxane)", ELECTROPHORESIS, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, DE, (20000101), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1522-2683(20000101)21:1<27::AID-ELPS27>3.0.CO;2-C, ISSN 0173-0835, pages 27 - 40, XP002278130

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2683(20000101)21:1<27::AID-ELPS27>3.0.CO;2-C
    - S G Patrick, "4.3.1 Hardness", Practical Guide to Polyvinyl Chloride, UK, Rapra Technology Limited, (20050101), pages 53 - 55, ISBN 18595751101, XP055121755
    - G. BORGES, K. KANAZAWA, M. LAZAGA, "Flow Cell With Flat Electroded Transducers.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, New York, US, (19900601), vol. 33, no. 1B, pages 262 - 263
    - KEIJI KANAZAWA K, G L BORGES, S K DOSS, "Simple flow cell for electrochemical gravimetry", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AESF ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE 1990 PUBL BY AMERICAN ELECTROPLATERS & SURFACE FINISHERS SOC INC, (1990), pages 353 - 365, XP009178385
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.