Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1539754

EP1539754 - BENZIMIDAZOLE QUINOLINONES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.09.2016  [2016/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2014/40]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
Former [2005/24]For all designated states
Chiron Corporation
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARSANTI, Paul, A., c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diag
4560 Horton street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
02 / BUSSIERE, Dirksen, c/o Novartos and Diagnostics
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
03 / HARRISON, Stephen, D.
1161 Santa Fe Avenue
Albany, CA 94706 / US
04 / HEISE, Carla, C.
436 Hawthorne Lane
Benicia, CA 94510 / US
05 / JANSEN, Johanna, M.
243 Mangels Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
06 / JAZAN, Elisa, c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostic
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
07 / MACHAJEWSKI, Timothy, D.
2514 Norwalk Court
Martinez, CA 94553 / US
08 / McBRIDE, Christopher
3107 Berlin Way
Oakland, CA 94602 / US
09 / McCREA, William, R.
1040 Amito Drive
Berkeley, CA 94705 / US
10 / NG, Simon
543 Pimlico Court
Walnut Creek, CA 94597 / US
11 / NI, Zhi-Jie, c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics
4560 Horton street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
12 / PECCHI, Sabina
5834 Merriewood Drive
Oakland, CA 94611 / US
13 / PFISTER, Keith
221 Promontory Terrace
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
14 / RAMURTHY, Savithri
1151 Maggie Lane
Walnut Creek, CA 94597 / US
15 / RENHOWE, Paul, A.
262 Stetson Drive
Danville, CA 94506 / US
16 / SHAFER, Cynthia, M.
4868 El Grande Place
El Sobrante, CA 94803 / US
17 / SILVER, Joel, B.
14 Essex Street, Apt. 1
Concord, NH 03301 / US
18 / WAGMAN, Allan
2 Ridgewood Court
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
19 / WIESMANN, Marion
512 Swallowtail Court
Brisbane, CA 94005 / US
 [2007/04]
Former [2005/24]01 / BARSANTI, Paul, A.
2316 B3 Ascot Drive
Moraga, CA 94556 / US
02 / BUSSIERE, Dirksen
4147 Waterfall Way
San Leandro, CA 94578 / US
03 / HARRISON, Stephen, D.
1161 Santa Fe Avenue
Albany, CA 94706 / US
04 / HEISE, Carla, C.
436 Hawthorne Lane
Benicia, CA 94510 / US
05 / JANSEN, Johanna, M.
243 Mangels Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
06 / JAZAN, Elisa
520 McLaughlin Avenue
Richmond, CA 94805 / US
07 / MACHAJEWSKI, Timothy, D.
2514 Norwalk Court
Martinez, CA 94553 / US
08 / McBRIDE, Christopher
3107 Berlin Way
Oakland, CA 94602 / US
09 / McCREA, William, R.
1040 Amito Drive
Berkeley, CA 94705 / US
10 / NG, Simon
543 Pimlico Court
Walnut Creek, CA 94597 / US
11 / NI, Zhi-Jie
34497 Winslow Terrace
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
12 / PECCHI, Sabina
5834 Merriewood Drive
Oakland, CA 94611 / US
13 / PFISTER, Keith
221 Promontory Terrace
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
14 / RAMURTHY, Savithri
1151 Maggie Lane
Walnut Creek, CA 94597 / US
15 / RENHOWE, Paul, A.
262 Stetson Drive
Danville, CA 94506 / US
16 / SHAFER, Cynthia, M.
4868 El Grande Place
El Sobrante, CA 94803 / US
17 / SILVER, Joel, B.
14 Essex Street, Apt. 1
Concord, NH 03301 / US
18 / WAGMAN, Allan
2 Ridgewood Court
Belmont, CA 94002 / US
19 / WIESMANN, Marion
512 Swallowtail Court
Brisbane, CA 94005 / US
Representative(s)Gruber, Markus
Novartis Pharma AG
Patent Department
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Gruber, Markus
Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2005/24]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date03781286.419.08.2003
[2005/24]
WO2003US25990
Priority number, dateUS20020405729P23.08.2002         Original published format: US 405729 P
US20020426282P13.11.2002         Original published format: US 426282 P
US20020426226P13.11.2002         Original published format: US 426226 P
US20020426107P13.11.2002         Original published format: US 426107 P
US20020428210P21.11.2002         Original published format: US 428210 P
US20030460327P03.04.2003         Original published format: US 460327 P
US20030460493P03.04.2003         Original published format: US 460493 P
US20030460328P03.04.2003         Original published format: US 460328 P
US20030478916P16.06.2003         Original published format: US 478916 P
US20030484048P01.07.2003         Original published format: US 484048 P
[2005/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004018419
Date:04.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1539754
Date:15.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004
[2005/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.06.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/435, A61P35/00
[2005/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BENZIMIDAZOLCHINOLINONE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2005/24]
English:BENZIMIDAZOLE QUINOLINONES AND USES THEREOF[2005/24]
French:QUINOLINONES DE BENZIMIDAZOLE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2005/24]
Entry into regional phase15.03.2005National basic fee paid 
15.03.2005Search fee paid 
15.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
15.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/24]
17.05.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/37]
11.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/37]
Divisional application(s)EP12186782.4  / EP2573079
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[DX]WO0222598  (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[XP]US6605617  (RENHOWE PAUL A [US], et al)