Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1535430

EP1535430 - Method for routing of data packets and routing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/22]METHOD FOR ROUTING OF DATA PACKETS AND ROUTING APPARATUS
[2007/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2008
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2007/40]
Former [2005/22]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JAGANNATHAN, Sankar Narayan, 378, Ground Fl.
325.10th A Main, 3rd Block,Jayanagar
Bangalore-560011 Karnataka / IN
02 / NIE, Xiaoning
Bgm-Schneider-Weg 85
85579 Neubiberg / DE
03 / LIN, Jinan
Ganghoferstr. 11
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
 [2005/33]
Former [2005/22]01 / JAGANNATHAN, Sankar Narayan, 378, Ground Fl.
36th Cross, 16 'A' Main, 4th T Block
Bangalore-560041 Jayanagar / IN
02 / NIE, Xiaoning
Bgm-Schneider-Weg 85
85579 Neubiberg / DE
03 / LIN, Jinan
Ganghoferstr. 11
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
Representative(s)Banzer, Hans-Jörg
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/22]Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing.
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date03784182.205.08.2003
[2005/22]
WO2003EP08663
Priority number, dateEP2002001768507.08.2002         Original published format: EP 02017685
[2005/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004015933
Date:19.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1535430
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004
[2005/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1535430
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04L29/06
[2005/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/48]
Former [2005/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Routen von Datenpaketen und Routing-Vorrichtung[2007/13]
English:Method for routing of data packets and routing apparatus[2007/13]
French:Procédé d'acheminement de paquets de données et appareil d'acheminement[2007/13]
Former [2005/22]VERFAHREN ZUM ROUTEN VON DATENPAKETEN UND ROUTING-VORRICHTUNG
Former [2005/22]METHOD FOR ROUTING OF DATA PACKETS AND ROUTING APPARATUS
Former [2005/22]PROCEDE D'ACHEMINEMENT DE PAQUETS DE DONNEES ET APPAREIL D'ACHEMINEMENT
Entry into regional phase05.01.2005National basic fee paid 
05.01.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/22]
14.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2007Fee for grant paid
14.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US5842224  (FENNER PETER R [US]) [X] 1-17 * column 4, line 45 - line 49 * * column 5, line 5 - line 9 * * column 16, line 21 - line 30 * * column 16, line 55 - column 17, line 10 * * column 17, line 40 - column 18, line 31 * * column 25, line 25 - line 30 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0978966  (ITALTEL SPA [IT]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] *;
 [A]  - HENRY HONG-YI TZENG ET AL, "ON FAST ADDRESS-LOOKUP ALGORITHMS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199906), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 1067 - 1082, XP002936422 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.772436
 [A]  - WITTEN I H ET AL, "ARITHMETIC CODING FOR DATA COMPRESSION", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, US, (19870601), vol. 30, no. 6, ISSN 0001-0782, pages 520 - 540, XP000615171 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/214762.214771