Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1534146

EP1534146 - CARDIAC DEVICES FOR PERCUTANEOUS REPAIR OF ATRIOVENTRICULAR VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/22]CARDIAC DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PERCUTANEOUS REPAIR OF ATRIOVENTRICULAR VALVES
[2007/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2008
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 08.12.2010  [2010/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2008/04]
Former [2005/22]For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEVINE, Robert, A.
60 Longwood Avenue
Brookline, MA 02146-5246 / US
 [2005/22]
Representative(s)Dilg, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/22]Dilg, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date03785293.613.08.2003
[2005/22]
WO2003US25521
Priority number, dateUS20020403073P13.08.2002         Original published format: US 403073 P
[2005/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004014282
Date:19.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1534146
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004
[2005/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1534146
Date:23.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/08, A61B17/064
[2005/45]
Former International [2005/22]A61B17/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERZVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DIE PERKUTANE REPARATUR VON ATRIOVENTRIKULÄREN KLAPPEN[2007/34]
English:CARDIAC DEVICES FOR PERCUTANEOUS REPAIR OF ATRIOVENTRICULAR VALVES[2007/34]
French:DISPOSITIFS CARDIAQUES DE REPARATION PERCUTANEE DES VALVULES AURICULOVENTRICULAIRES[2007/34]
Former [2005/22]HERZVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE PERKUTANE REPARATUR VON ATRIOVENTRIKULÄREN KLAPPEN
Former [2005/22]CARDIAC DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PERCUTANEOUS REPAIR OF ATRIOVENTRICULAR VALVES
Former [2005/22]DISPOSITIFS CARDIAQUES ET PROCEDES DE REPARATION PERCUTANEE DES VALVULES AURICULOVENTRICULAIRES
Entry into regional phase15.03.2005National basic fee paid 
15.03.2005Search fee paid 
15.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/22]
04.05.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2007Fee for grant paid
12.12.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07122916.5  / EP1917919
EP10185283.8  / EP2319427
Opposition(s)24.10.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.03.2005AT   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005BE   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005BG   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005CH   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005CY   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005CZ   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005DK   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005EE   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005ES   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005FI   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005GB   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005GR   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005HU   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005IE   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005IT   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005LU   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005MC   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005NL   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005PT   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005RO   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005SE   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005SI   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005SK   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
15.03.2005TR   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.03.2005M01   Fee paid on   15.03.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CY23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
EE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
IT23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
TR23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
GR24.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
HU24.07.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
[2010/49]
Former [2010/37]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CY23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
EE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
IT23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
TR23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
HU24.07.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2010/34]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CY23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
EE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
IT23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
HU24.07.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2010/32]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CY23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
EE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
IT23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
IE13.08.2008
LU13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/40]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CY23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
EE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
IT23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
IE13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/35]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CY23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
EE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
IE13.08.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/22]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
EE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2009/18]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
MC31.08.2008
Former [2008/49]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
CZ23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
NL23.01.2008
RO23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
SK23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/46]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
DK23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/44]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
SI23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/43]AT23.01.2008
BE23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/42]AT23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/39]AT23.01.2008
CH23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
BG23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
Former [2008/36]CH23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
ES04.05.2008
Former [2008/35]CH23.01.2008
LI23.01.2008
ES04.05.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0060995  (EVALVE INC [US]) [X] 1-12,14-18 * page 23, lines 11-28 * * page 25, line 29 - page 26, line 22 * * page 32, lines 3-21 * * page 52, lines 3-13 * * page 56, lines 26-33 * * page 59, lines 10-14 * * abstract *;
 [X]WO9913777  (SEGUIN JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,2,9,11,13,17 * abstract * * page 9, lines 24-34 *;
 [X]US2002013571  (GOLDFARB ERIC A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9-11,17 * paragraphs [0094] , [0109] , [0120] - [0122]; figures 8,9,13-15,22-23b,28-30 *;
 [A]WO0128432  (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US]) [A] * figure - *
International search[X]US6165183  (KUEHN STEPHEN T [US], et al);
 [A]US6269819  (OZ MEHMET C [US], et al);
 [A]US6312447  (GRIMES RANDALL Y [US])
by applicantUS6312447