blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1572510

EP1572510 - WASHER FLUID SQUIRT DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE WINDSCREEN WASHER JETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.05.2008  [2008/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FICO TRANSPAR, S.A.
98, Gran Via Carlos III
08022 Barcelona / ES
[2005/37]
Inventor(s)01 / MOTA LOPEZ, Miguel
Calle Oreneta, 28
E-08191 Rubi / ES
02 / ELVIRA PERALTA, Juan
98, Gran Via Carlos III (FICO TRANSPAR)
E-08022 Barcelona / ES
 [2007/10]
Former [2005/37]01 / MOTA LOPEZ, Miguel
Calle Oreneta, 28
E-08191 Rubi / ES
02 / ELVIRA PERALTA, Juan
Calle Monturiol Universo, 1
E-08191 Rubi / ES
Representative(s)Sugrañes, S.L.P.
Calle Provenza 304
08008 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2005/37]SUGRANES - VERDONCES - FERREGÜELA
304 Calle Provenza
08008 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date03785668.926.11.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003EP13301
Priority number, dateES2002000293720.12.2002         Original published format: ES 200202937
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004056627
Date:08.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1572510
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1572510
Date:13.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.2004
ClassificationIPC:B60S1/52, B05B1/04
[2005/37]
CPC:
B05B1/04 (EP,ES,US); B60S1/52 (EP,ES,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/15]
Former [2005/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHEIBENWASCHDÜSE VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN[2005/37]
English:WASHER FLUID SQUIRT DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE WINDSCREEN WASHER JETS[2005/37]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GIGLEUR DE LIQUIDE DE LAVE-GLACE POUR DES GICLEURS DE LAVE-GLACE DE PARE-BRISE DE VEHICULE[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2005National basic fee paid 
21.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
11.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2007Fee for grant paid
25.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2062452  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * page 1, line 115 - page 2, line 19 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US4865059  (LELEVE JOEL [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 40 - line 60 ** figure - *;
 [AD]FR2726204  (SEIM IND [FR]) [AD] 1 * page 6, line 4 - line 24 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5975431  (HARITA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 42 - line 52 * * column 4, line 1 - line 29 * * figure - *;
 [A]US6082636  (YOSHIDA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]FR2803542  (RENAULT [FR]) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 10 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]WO0226537  (MITSUBA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO02060589  (FICO TRANSPAR SA [ES], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 6 - line 24 * * page 5, line 10 - line 25 * * figure - *
by applicantES200100234
 FR2726204
 FR2803542
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.