Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1572755 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1572755



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1864
06.05.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
01.05.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.04.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 51
17.04.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 3
28.11.2018 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 6
13.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.11.2018 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
29.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
22.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
22.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
15.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
05.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.08.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
10.08.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 3
07.08.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
23.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.07.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
16.07.2018 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
13.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.07.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 27
09.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.06.2018 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
06.06.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
17.05.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 4
22.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.03.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.11.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.11.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.11.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.11.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
08.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.10.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.10.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 3
20.10.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
20.10.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
20.10.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
17.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.10.2017 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
12.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
06.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
06.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
06.10.2017 Claims Appeal 3
06.10.2017 Claims Appeal 3
06.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.10.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.10.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.10.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 6
29.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.09.2017 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
21.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.09.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.09.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
12.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.05.2017 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 1
12.04.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
12.04.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
12.04.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
10.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.04.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.04.2017 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
30.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.03.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.08.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
25.04.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
25.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.04.2016 General authorisation Appeal 1
15.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.04.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
03.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
31.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
30.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
26.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
24.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 13
20.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.03.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 14
21.11.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.11.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.11.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
07.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
07.11.2014 Claims Appeal 4
07.11.2014 Claims Appeal 4
07.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.11.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
16.09.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
11.09.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.09.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Annex Opposition 2
09.07.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
09.07.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
09.07.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
09.07.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
09.07.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
25.04.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Opposition 1
24.04.2014 Citation for the examination procedure Opposition 20
24.04.2014 Claims Opposition 5
24.04.2014 Claims Opposition 3
24.04.2014 Claims Opposition 3
24.04.2014 Claims Opposition 4
24.04.2014 Claims Opposition 5
24.04.2014 Claims Opposition 5
24.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
24.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
31.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Annex Opposition 13
12.07.2013 Annex Opposition 9
12.07.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
12.07.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 4
06.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.08.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
22.06.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.06.2012 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.02.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.02.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.02.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.01.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.01.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
29.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
29.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
29.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
29.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 73
29.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
29.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 76
22.12.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
22.12.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
22.12.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
22.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
22.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
22.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 73
22.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
22.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 57
24.05.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
09.03.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.03.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.02.2011 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
13.02.2011 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
13.02.2011 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
24.01.2011 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
22.12.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
22.12.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
10.09.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
10.09.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
10.09.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.09.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
21.05.2010 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
04.12.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
04.11.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
13.08.2009 Description Search / examination 28
13.08.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
04.08.2009 Description Search / examination 24
04.08.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.07.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.07.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
10.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
10.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
02.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
02.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
01.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
01.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.06.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.06.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.06.2009 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.06.2009 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.06.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.06.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
16.06.2009 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.06.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.06.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.05.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
18.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
18.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
18.05.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
24.04.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.04.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.04.2009 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.04.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
15.04.2009 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.04.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
07.04.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.03.2009 Annex Search / examination 2
30.03.2009 Annex Search / examination 5
30.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
30.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
30.03.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 6
26.03.2009 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
26.03.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.03.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
30.12.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.12.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.12.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 76
08.12.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 72
08.12.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
08.12.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 3
25.11.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.07.2006 Annex Search / examination 5
12.07.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
12.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
12.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
12.07.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.05.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.05.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.01.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.01.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.07.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
12.07.2005 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
07.07.2005 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
08.06.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.06.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.06.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
08.06.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
08.06.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.06.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.06.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.06.2005 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.05.2005 Despatch of copy of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.05.2005 Despatch of copy of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.05.2005 Result of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.05.2005 Result of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.05.2005 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.05.2005 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
27.05.2005 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.05.2005 Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.05.2005 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.05.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.05.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
11.05.2005 General authorisation Search / examination 1
11.05.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
15.04.2005 Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure Search / examination 1
30.03.2005 Mailing list for the IB (for internal ISA use) Search / examination 2
23.09.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
23.09.2004 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
04.08.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
04.08.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 58
09.07.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO Search / examination 1
09.07.2004 Notification of receipt of demand Search / examination 1
08.07.2004 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 55
01.07.2004 Letter regarding PCTII procedure Search / examination 1
28.01.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.01.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 5
28.01.2004 Description International Searching Authority 47
28.01.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 2
18.12.2003 General authorisation Search / examination 1