Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1572219

EP1572219 - EFFICIENT METHOD FOR PRODUCING COMPOSITIONS ENRICHED IN TOTAL PHENOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phenolics, LLC
P.O. Box 2439, 846 San Carlos Avenue
El Granada, CA 94108-2439 / US
[2005/37]
Inventor(s)01 / GOURDIN, Gerald, T.
1700 17th,Unit A7
Boulder, CO 80302 / US
02 / RICHHEIMER, Steven, L.
10551 West 102nd Avenue
Westminster, CO 80021 / US
03 / TEMPESTA, Michael, S.
P.O.Box 2439, 846 San Carlos Avenue
El Granada, CA 94018-2439 / US
04 / BAILEY, David, T.
328 Overlook Lane
Boulder, CO 80306 / US
05 / NICHOLS, Rebecca
5123 Yates Place
Broomfield, CO 80020 / US
06 / DAUGHERTY, F., Joseph
10308 Rockbrook Road
Omaha, NE 68124 / US
07 / FREEBERG, Delano, R., c/o API Purifications Inc.
4595 Nathan Lane North 102
Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US
 [2007/03]
Former [2007/01]01 / GOURDIN, Gerald, T.
805 29th Street 403
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
02 / RICHHEIMER, Steven, L.
10551 West 102nd Avenue
Westminster, CO 80021 / US
03 / TEMPESTA, Michael, S.
846 San Carlos Avenue
El Granada, CA 94019 / US
04 / BAILEY, David, T.
328 Overlook Lane
Boulder, CO 80306 / US
05 / NICHOLS, Rebecca
5123 Yates Place
Broomfield, CO 80020 / US
06 / DAUGHERTY, F., Joseph
10308 Rockbrook Road
Omaha, NE 68124 / US
07 / FREEBERG, Delano, R., c/o API Purifications Inc.
4595 Nathan Lane North 102
Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US
Former [2005/37]01 / GOURDIN, Gerald, T.
805 29th Street 403
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
02 / RICHHEIMER, Steven, L.
10551 West 122nd Avenue
Westminster, CO 80021 / US
03 / TEMPESTA, Michael, S.
846 San Carlos Avenue
El Granada, CA 94019 / US
04 / BAILEY, David, T.
328 Overlook Lane
Boulder, CO 80306 / US
05 / NICHOLS, Rebecca
5123 Yates Place
Broomfield, CO 80020 / US
06 / DAUGHERTY, F., Joseph
10308 Rockbrook Road
Omaha, NE 68124 / US
07 / FREEBERG, Delano, R., 2413 West Algonquin road
417
Algonquin, IL 60102 / US
Representative(s)Walsh, Marie Goretti , et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2013/44]Lucy, Sinéad , et al
Hanna, Moore & Curley
13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2005/37]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date03787068.021.11.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003US37491
Priority number, dateUS2002030226422.11.2002         Original published format: US 302264
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004047847
Date:10.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1572219
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004
[2005/37]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US10.06.2004
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7048, A61K35/78, A61K47/00
[2005/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHLAGKRÄFTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIT GESAMTPHENOLEN ANGEREICHERTEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2005/37]
English:EFFICIENT METHOD FOR PRODUCING COMPOSITIONS ENRICHED IN TOTAL PHENOLS[2005/37]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION EFFICACE DE COMPOSITIONS ENRICHIES EN PHENOLS TOTAUX[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2005National basic fee paid 
22.06.2005Search fee paid 
22.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
24.08.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2010Observations by third parties
13.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/32]
02.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200604   M06   Fee paid on   05.12.2006
30.11.200705   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.2008
30.11.201412   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0217732  (HAUSER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0217945  (HAUSER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9206695  (SHAMAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 16-25 * the whole document *;
 [X]CA1086651  (CANADA MAJESTY IN RIGHT OF) [X] 16-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS61130297
 [A]  - 0, vol. 1986, no. 31, Database accession no. 1986-199710, XP002531732 [A] 1-25 * the whole document *
International search[Y]GB1235379  (SOC D RECH S IND S O R I [FR]);
 [Y]US4500556  (LANGSTON METTY S K [US]);
 [Y]US5200186  (GABETTA BRUNO [US], et al)
other   - "Tabeekh Bara-e-Warm-e-Kulya Wa Masanah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/2989, XP003029821
    - MOHAMMAD ALMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, page 620,
    - "Sharbat-e-Petha", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/119A1, XP003029822
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, vol. II, page 132,
    - "Dawa-e-Surfa Wabaai", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/1096, XP003029823
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, pages 182 - 183,
    - "Sharbat Bara-e-Ramad Haar", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. BA3/795G, XP003029824
    - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KAHN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, pages 128 - 129,
    - "Maha Cincadi Lehyam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VK1/159, XP003029825
    - BASAVARAJA, Basavarajayam-Chaukhambha, pages 83 - 84,
    - "Triphaladikvathah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK/163, XP003029826
    - GOVINDA DASA, Bhaisajya Ratnavali, vol. 14, page 61,
    - "Thiraakshaadhi Nei", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. SK03/209, XP003029544
    - KANNUSAMY, Chikithsa Rathna Deepam, page 197,
    - "Sharbat-e-unnab", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/852, XP003029827
    - MOHAMAMD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, page 123,
    - "Kaseera/kateera", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH2/90, XP003029828
    - ZIYA AL-ABDULLAH IBN BAITAR, Din Al-Jaam'e-li-Mufradaat-al-Advia-wal-Al-Aghzia, vol. IV, pages 52 - 53,
    - "Dawa-e-Chashm", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH2/90D, XP003029829
    - ZIYA AL ABDULLAH IBN AL BAITAR, Din Al-Jaam'e-li-Mufradaat-al-Advia-wal-Al-Aghzia, vol. IV, page 53,
    - "Qahwa-e-chai", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/3621, XP003029830
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, vol. 2, page 549,
    - "Zimaad-e-chai Barai Warm-e-muzmin", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/324A, XP003029831
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL KHAN, Khazaai-al-Advia, vol. II, page 342,
    - "Goraksavati", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS21/296, XP003029832
    - Rasatantrasarah Evam Siddhaprayogasamgrahah, vol. II, pages 275 - 276,
    - "Majuphaladi Vati", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS4/916, XP003029833
    - KRYNARAMA BHATTA, Siddhabhesajamanimalah, vol. 3, page 289,