Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1529383

EP1529383 - ROUTER ATTACHMENTS BETWEEN ROAMING MOBILE ROUTERS IN A MOBILE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/19]ARRANGEMENT FOR ROUTER ATTACHMENTS BETWEEN ROAMING MOBILE ROUTERS IN A MOBILE NETWORK
[2018/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cisco Technology, Inc.
170 West Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US
[2005/19]
Inventor(s)01 / THUBERT, Pascal
La Pinatelo Villa 13
Chemin des Bas Campons
F-06480 La Colle Sur Loup / FR
02 / WETTERWALD, Patrick
1249 Chemin des Plaines
F-06370 Mouans Sartoux / FR
03 / MOLTENI, Marco
448, Ch. Des Hautes Breguieres
Res. Le Clos de 1'Angelus, BAT 1A
F-006600 Antibes / FR
04 / FORSTER, David Charlton
12 Springhill Road
Goring-on Thames
Reading
Berks RG8 0DA / GB
 [2018/51]
Former [2007/01]01 / THUBERT, Pascal
La Pinatelo Villa 13, Chemin des Bas Campons
F-06480 La Colle Sur Loup / FR
02 / WETTERWALD, Patrick
1249 Chemin des Plaines
F-06370 Mouans Sartoux / FR
03 / MOLTENI, Marco 448, Ch. Des Hautes Breguieres
Res. Le Clos de 1'Angelus, BAT 1A
FR-006600 Antibes / FR
04 / FORSTER, David Charlton
12 Springhill Road, Goring-on Thames, Reading
Berks RG8 0DA / GB
Former [2005/19]01 / THUBERT, Pascal
La Pinatelo Villa 13, Chemin des Bas Campons
F-06480 La Colle Sur Loup / FR
02 / WETTERWALD, Patrick
32 Chemin de Saint Laurent
F-06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR
03 / MOLTENI, Marco
36, Vieux Chemin de St. Jean
F-06600 Antibes / FR
04 / FORSTER, David Charlton
12 Springhill Road, Goring-on Thames, Reading
Berks RG8 0DA / GB
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/51]
Former [2005/47]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2005/19]Brookes Batchellor LLP
102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date03788532.414.08.2003
[2018/51]
WO2003US25615
Priority number, dateUS2002021851515.08.2002         Original published format: US 218515
[2005/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004017582
Date:26.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1529383
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004
[2005/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1529383
Date:19.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/00, H04L12/24, H04L12/751, // H04W40/00, H04W40/24, H04W40/38
[2018/30]
Former International [2005/19]H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/51]
Former [2005/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Former [N/P]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ROUTER-ANBINDUNG ZWISCHEN UMHERSTREIFENDEN MOBILEN ROUTERN IN EINEM MOBILEN NETZ[2018/30]
English:ROUTER ATTACHMENTS BETWEEN ROAMING MOBILE ROUTERS IN A MOBILE NETWORK[2018/30]
French:RACCORDEMENTS DE ROUTEURS ENTRE DES ROUTEURS MOBILES ITINERANTS DANS UN RESEAU MOBILE[2018/30]
Former [2005/19]ANORDNUNG ZUR ROUTER-ANBINDUNG ZWISCHEN UMHERSTREIFENDEN MOBILEN ROUTERN IN EINEM MOBILEN NETZ
Former [2005/19]ARRANGEMENT FOR ROUTER ATTACHMENTS BETWEEN ROAMING MOBILE ROUTERS IN A MOBILE NETWORK
Former [2005/19]INSTALLATION POUR RACCORDEMENTS DE ROUTEURS ENTRE DES ROUTEURS MOBILES ITINERANTS DANS UN RESEAU MOBILE
Entry into regional phase23.02.2005National basic fee paid 
23.02.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2005Examination requested  [2005/19]
17.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2018Fee for grant paid
07.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2009
Opposition(s)20.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
03.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
08.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
DK19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
[2019/48]
Former [2019/46]AT19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/40]CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/37]CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/35]CZ19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/34]FI19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/33]FI19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/30]FI19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI19.12.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US2001046223  (SOLIMAN HESHAM ET AL) [X] 1-33 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 3,4,6,7 *;
 [PX]WO03033109  (BOEING CO) [PX] 1,2,11-13,22-24,33 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024] *;
 [E]EP1381200  (NTT DOCOMO INC) [E] 1-33 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 1-3,5 *;
 [A]WO0106717  (BRITISH TELECOMM ; NEILL ALAN WILLIAM O (GB); CORSON MATHEW SCOTT (US)) [A] 1,12,23 * page 7, line 1 - line 6 *;
 [X]  - SOLIMAN H ET AL, "Hierarchical MIPv6 mobility management (HMIPv6) draft-ietf-mobileip-hmipv6-06.txt", IETF, (20020705), XP002253178 [X] 1-33 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [05.1] , [05.3] , [05.4] , [07.1] , [7.3.1] , [11.1] *
 [DA]  - P. THUBERT, M. MOLTENI, "IPv6 Reverse Routing Header and its application to Mobile Networks, draft-thubert-nemo-reverse-routing-header-00.txt", IETF WORKING GROUP NEMO, (20020719), pages 1 - 37, XP002283632 [DA] 1-33 * paragraph [06.2] *
 [A]  - DEERING S, "ICMP Router Discovery Messages", IETF, (199209), XP002240319 [A] 1-33 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [04.1] , [05.1] , [05.3] *