blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1528945 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1528945



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 403
09.09.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.01.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.12.2012 Closing of application Search / examination 1
06.09.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
22.03.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.03.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
15.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
15.02.2012 Description Search / examination 3
15.02.2012 Drawings Search / examination 1
15.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.10.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
13.10.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.03.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.03.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.08.2004 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
09.08.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
09.08.2004 Annex Search / examination 8
09.08.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.06.2004 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 10
26.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
26.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
26.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 7
26.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 61
26.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
15.04.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
15.04.2004 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.02.2004 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 81
06.10.2003 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
06.10.2003 Claims International Searching Authority 8
06.10.2003 Description International Searching Authority 42
06.10.2003 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
06.10.2003 Drawings International Searching Authority 29