blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1528945


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.12.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]
05.09.2012 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
14.08.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.03.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.02.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.10.2011 First examination report
11.10.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.08.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.08.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.08.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
11.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.08.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.08.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2005 Change - extension states published on  07.12.2005  [2005/49]
09.09.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.05.2005  [2005/19]
25.03.2005 Request for examination filed published on  11.05.2005  [2005/19]
15.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2004 Amendment by applicant
16.04.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
05.03.2004 PCT data prior to European publication