Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1528945

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure06.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/04]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2004National basic fee paid 
03.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:11.05.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20040903
 
Event date:11.05.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:11.05.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Event date:07.12.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:16.11.2011 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20111013
 
Event date:23.01.2013 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20120802