Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1528945

EP1528945 - CATHETER SECUREMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2013  [2013/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Venetec International, Inc.
12555 High Bluff Drive, Suite 170
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]For all designated states
Venetec International, Inc.
12555 High Bluff Drive, Suite 170
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BIERMAN, Steven, F.
143 Eighth Street
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
 [2005/19]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2005/19]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date03788538.115.08.2003
WO2003US25622
Priority number, dateUS20020404354P15.08.2002         Original published format: US 404354 P
US20020411127P16.09.2002         Original published format: US 411127 P
US20020414999P30.09.2002         Original published format: US 414999 P
US20020418389P11.10.2002         Original published format: US 418389 P
US20030454430P11.03.2003         Original published format: US 454430 P
[2005/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004016309
Date:26.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1528945
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004
[2005/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/02
[2005/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/19]
Former [N/P]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATHETERFIXIERVORRICHTUNG[2005/19]
English:CATHETER SECUREMENT DEVICE[2005/19]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE CATHETER[2005/19]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2004National basic fee paid 
03.09.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2004Examination requested  [2005/19]
13.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/04]
06.09.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.10.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9715337  (VENETEC INT INC [US]) [X] 1-5,10-13,19-23,25-27,29-33,37-42,44-48,53-60 * the whole document * [Y] 6-9,14-18,24,28,34-36,43,49-51;
 [Y]US5413562  (SWAUGER JONATHAN L [US]) [Y] 6-9,14-18,24,28,34-36,43,49-51 * column W *;
 [A]WO9421319  (BIERMAN STEVEN F [US]) [A] 1-60 * the whole document *