Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1700499

EP1700499 - METHOD AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATICALLY DISCOVERING THE MULTMEDIA SERVICE CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2011
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2010/24]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
Patent Unit, KI/ECS/B/AP
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BLECKERT, Peter
Stigbergsvägen 3
S-752 42 Uppsala / SE
02 / STILLE, Mats
Vintertullstorget 32
S-116 43 Stockholm / SE
 [2006/37]
Representative(s)Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia
Torhamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2006/37]Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date03789675.030.12.2003
[2006/37]
WO2003SE02099
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005064958
Date:14.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1700499
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005
[2006/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1700499
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/16, H04M7/00
[2010/01]
Former International [2006/37]H04Q7/22, H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ENTDECKEN DER MULTIMEDIA-DIENSTFÄHIGKEIT[2006/37]
English:METHOD AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATICALLY DISCOVERING THE MULTMEDIA SERVICE CAPABILITY[2006/37]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION PERMETTANT DE DECOUVRIR AUTOMATIQUEMENT LA CAPACITE DE SERVICE MULTIMEDIA[2006/37]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2006National basic fee paid 
16.05.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
16.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/37]
13.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2010Fee for grant paid
23.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
TR23.06.2010
BG23.09.2010
GR24.09.2010
ES04.10.2010
PT25.10.2010
HU24.12.2010
IE30.12.2010
LU30.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
[2013/46]
Former [2013/42]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
TR23.06.2010
BG23.09.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
HU24.12.2010
IE30.12.2010
LU30.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/47]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
BG23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
TR23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
HU24.12.2010
IE30.12.2010
LU30.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/44]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
BG23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
HU24.12.2010
IE30.12.2010
LU30.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/42]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
BG23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
HU24.12.2010
IE30.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2012/41]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
BG23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
IE30.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/47]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
IE30.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/36]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/19]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
DK23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
Former [2011/14]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
IT23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
Former [2011/13]AT23.06.2010
BE23.06.2010
CY23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
Former [2011/10]AT23.06.2010
CZ23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
RO23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
SK23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
PT25.10.2010
Former [2011/08]AT23.06.2010
EE23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
NL23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
Former [2011/01]AT23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
GR24.09.2010
Former [2010/52]AT23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
SI23.06.2010
Former [2010/50]AT23.06.2010
FI23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
Former [2010/49]AT23.06.2010
SE23.06.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US6161008  ;
 [A]US6577718  ;
 [A]US6640248