blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1541066

EP1541066 - SHELF CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Obchestvo S Ogranichennoy Otvetstvennost'U "U.T.M."
ul. Gangutskaya, 14
St. Petersburg, 191187 / RU
For all designated states
Varfolomeeva, Elena Petrovna
ul. Basseinaya, 47-7
St. Petersburg, 196070 / RU
[2005/24]
Inventor(s)01 / VARFOLOMEEVA, Elena Petrovna
ul. Basseinaya, 47-7
St.Petersburg, 196070 / RU
 [2005/24]
Representative(s)Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al
Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/24]Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date03791508.929.08.2003
[2005/24]
WO2003RU00396
Priority number, dateRU2002012332030.08.2002         Original published format: RU 2002123320
[2005/24]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004019735
Date:11.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1541066
Date:15.06.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU11.03.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2005
ClassificationIPC:A47F5/00, A47B57/00, A47F5/13
[2005/37]
CPC:
A47F5/01 (EP); A47B57/16 (EP); A47B57/44 (EP);
A47F5/0031 (EP); A47F5/0043 (EP); A47F5/13 (EP)
Former IPC [2005/24]A47F5/00, A47B57/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REGALKONSTRUKTION[2005/24]
English:SHELF CONSTRUCTION[2005/24]
French:STRUCTURE DE RAYONNAGES[2005/24]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2005Translation filed 
30.03.2005National basic fee paid 
30.03.2005Search fee paid 
30.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/24]
28.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/26]
13.02.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200604   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB914654  (VERSATILE FITTINGS W H S LTD, et al) [A] 1,2* figure - *;
 [A]CH381518  (SPINNER ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure - *;
 [A]DE29704917U  (WINKELHARDT HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]US6089387  (VARFOLOMEEVA ELENA P [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]RU2071266  (LUUKKONEN IRJA [FI]);
 [A]RU2136200  (OBSHCHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOJ OT);
 [A]RU13305U  ;
 [A]SU1240407  (TALLIN N PROIZV OB NETKANYKH M [SU]);
 [A]EP0682898  (RYSLINGE TRAEVARE APS [DK]);
 [A]US4444322  (LEE VERNON E [US]);
 [A]US6311856  (BATTAGLIA JOSEPH M [US], et al)
by applicantWO8900824
 US4513344
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.